Vasquez, Jr. v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Francisco Jesus Vasquez, Jr.
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 3:2022cv01961
Filed: December 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 wc Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Oscar Gonzalez de Llano (Gonzalez de Llano, Oscar) (ddf).
February 1, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Oscar Gonzalez de Llano on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Gonzalez de Llano, Oscar)Attorney Oscar Gonzalez de Llano added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft) (ddf).
January 19, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Parker on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft) (alns).
January 6, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER. Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt is no longer assigned as presiding judge. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv1961-BEN-JLB.(no document attached) (sjt)
December 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE: IFP granted by Judge Jill Burkhardt. The Notice of Electronic Filing of Complaint regenerated to Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel by the court and suffices for service of the complaint. The Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. (no document attached) (exs)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 12/21/2022. (exs)
December 12, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Jill L. Burkhardt has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff should print and complete the attached consent/declination form. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. The Notice of Electronic Filing of the complaint sent by the court to the Commissioner suffices for service of the complaint. The Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. (fth) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/12/2022) (fth). (rmc).
December 12, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Francisco Jesus Vasquez, Jr. (fth) (rmc).
December 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, IFP Filed, filed by Fr ancisco Jesus Vasquez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:22-cv-1961-JLB. Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt is assigned to the case. (Yancey, Martha) (fth) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez, Jr. v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Jesus Vasquez, Jr.
Represented By: Martha W. Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Social Security Administration Office of General C
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Represented By: Oscar Gonzalez de Llano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?