Wright v. Greenlight Financial Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joan Wright
Defendant: Greenlight Financial Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv02025
Filed: December 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Q Hayes
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
2 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
3 Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2511 Wiretapping - Injunctive Relief or Civil Fine
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to Dismiss All Claims (ECF #17 ) and Close Case. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/1/2023.(jms)
April 27, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joan Wright (Shay, Daniel) (ddf).
April 4, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Greenlight Financial Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Noto in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-3 to Declaration of Ashley Noto, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Declaration of Rebekah Guyon in Support of Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 4-6 to Declaration of Rebekah Guyon)(Guyon, Rebekah) (jms).
April 4, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Greenlight Financial Technology, Inc. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Greenlight Financial Technology, Inc. - and Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (Guyon, Rebekah)(jms).
April 3, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Greenlight Financial Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Noto in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1-3 to Declaration of Ashley Noto, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Declaration of Rebekah Guyon in Support of Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 4-6 to Declaration of Rebekah Guyon)(Guyon, Rebekah) QC mailer sent re no hearing date/time, instructed to refile (jms).
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (AGS): In light of the filing of the First Amended Complaint (see ECF #12 ), defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF #10 ) is denied as moot. By April 11, 2023, defendant shall respond to the FAC. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 04/03/2023. (no document attached) (raw)
March 20, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Greenlight Financial Technology, Inc., filed by Joan Wright. (Shay, Daniel) (jms).
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Linda Lopez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Andrew G. Schopler for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv2025-AGS-NLS. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 3/20/2023.(ddf)
February 20, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Greenlight Financial Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Noto in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1-3 to Declaration of Ashley Noto, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Declaration of Rebekah S. Guyon in Support of Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 and 5 to Declaration of Rebekah Guyon)(Guyon, Rebekah) *Motion under submission, no appearances are required unless ordered by the Court. (ddf).
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint [ECF No. #8 ]. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 2/9/2023. (ddf)
February 7, 2023 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Greenlight Financial Technology, Inc.. (Guyon, Rebekah) (ddf).
January 20, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Nelson on behalf of Joan Wright (Nelson, John)Attorney John J. Nelson added to party Joan Wright(pty:pla) (ddf).
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint [ECF No. #5 ]. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 1/11/2023. (ddf)
January 10, 2023 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Pursuant to S.D. CAL. L.R. 7.2 by Greenlight Financial Technology, Inc.. (Guyon, Rebekah)Attorney Rebekah Strawn Guyon added to party Greenlight Financial Technology, Inc.(pty:dft) (ddf).
December 22, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joan Wright. Greenlight Financial Technology, Inc. served. (Shay, Daniel) (ddf).
December 22, 2022 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. District Judge William Q. Hayes is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22CV2025-LL-NLS.(no document attached) (alns)
December 20, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt)
December 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greenlight Financial Technology, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17440991). Filed by Joan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-2025-WQH-NLS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Swigart, Joshua)(sjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Greenlight Financial Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Wright
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Represented By: John J. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenlight Financial Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Rebekah Strawn Guyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?