Diggs v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Seth Diggs
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 3:2022cv02051
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision (regarding payment of benefits)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Joint Motion For Extension Of Time To File Answer [ECF No. #11 ]. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 2/15/2023. (ddf)
February 15, 2023 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Triesch, Heidi) (ddf).
February 2, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Heidi Triesch (Triesch, Heidi) (ddf).
February 1, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi Triesch on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Triesch, Heidi)Attorney Heidi Triesch added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft) (ddf).
January 23, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER. Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt is no longer assigned as presiding judge. Case reassigned to Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv2051-LL-JLB.(no document attached) (sjt)
January 19, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Parker on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft) (exs).
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 Fee for Civil Case Opening: $ 402, receipt number ACASDC-17465541, Paid on 1/3/2023. (no document attached) (Benavides, Francesco)
January 3, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Seth Diggs. (Benavides, Francesco)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: (1) Denying #2 without Prejudice Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and (2) Screening and Dismissing Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2); Plaintiffshall have until 1/20/2023 to file an amended complaint that cures the deficienciesset forth above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 1/3/2023. (exs)
December 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Jill L. Burkhardt has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff should print and complete the attached consent/declination form. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 calendar days of the date of this notice. The Notice of Electronic Filing of the complaint sent by the court to the Commissioner suffices for service of the complaint. The Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. (maq) (anh).
December 27, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Seth Diggs. (maq) (anh).
December 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi (Filing fee $ 402.) IFP Pending, filed by Seth Diggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:22-cv-2051-JLB. Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt is assigned to the case. (Francesco P. Benavides)(maq) (anh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diggs v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Diggs
Represented By: Francesco P. Benavides
Represented By: Francesco Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Social Security Administration Office of General C
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Heidi Triesch
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?