Velasco Ames v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Velasco Ames
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 3:2022cv02074
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 id Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for extension of time. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/23/2023. (jpp)
February 23, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, unopposed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Martin, Justin) (jpp).
February 2, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Justin Lane Martin (Martin, Justin) (jpp).
February 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Lane Martin on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Martin, Justin)Attorney Justin Lane Martin added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft) (jpp).
January 24, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER. Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford is no longer assigned as presiding judge. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22CV2074-DMS-KSC.(no document attached) (sjt)
January 19, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Parker on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft) (exs).
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Karen S. Crawford has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff should print and complete the attached consent/declination form. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. The Notice of Electronic Filing of the complaint sent by the court to the Commissioner suffices for service of the complaint. The Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. (sjt)
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17459070). Filed by Reynaldo Velasco Ames. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-2074-KSC. Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford is assigned to the case. (Benavides, Francesco)(sjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasco Ames v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Velasco Ames
Represented By: Francesco P. Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Social Security Administration Office of General C
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?