Stearns v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Richard Stearns
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 3:2023cv00098
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 wc Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford is no longer assigned as presiding judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23CV098-KSC.(no document attached) (sjt)
March 16, 2023 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Gonzalez de Llano, Oscar) (cxl1).
February 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Oscar Gonzalez de Llano on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Gonzalez de Llano, Oscar)Attorney Oscar Gonzalez de Llano added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft) (maq).
February 24, 2023 Filing 6 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Pursuant to General Order 707, by Richard Stearns. (ddf)
February 14, 2023 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford is no longer assigned as presiding judge. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv098-W-KSC.(no document attached) (sjt)
January 24, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Parker on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft) (exs).
January 19, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of consent to jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Richard Stearns (Drake, Roger) (QC Mailer sent asking attorney to withdraw and resubmit in paper with both signatures) (exs).
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Karen S. Crawford has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff should print and complete the attached consent/declination form. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. The Notice of Electronic Filing of the complaint sent by the court to the Commissioner suffices for service of the complaint. The Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. (ggv) (sjt).
January 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17509770.), filed by Richard Stearns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:23-cv-98-KSC. Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford is assigned to the case. (Drake, Roger)(ggv) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stearns v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Stearns
Represented By: Roger David Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Social Security Administration Office of General C
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Oscar Gonzalez de Llano
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?