Nguyen v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Dai Nguyen
Defendant: K. Williams, D. Zepeda, D. Gray, Barrio and A. Barrios
Case Number: 3:2023cv01142
Filed: June 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Jinsook Ohta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dai Nguyen. (bdc)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter requesting correction of name from Dai Nguyen. Defendant's name changed from Barrio to A. Barrios per letter & PSLC. (bdc)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Jinsook Ohta Accepting re #1 Complaint,, from Plaintiff Dai Nguyen. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Rules of Procedure for the Electronic Submission of Litigation for Plaintiffs Incarcerated at Certain Identified CDCR Facilities. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 06/20/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(bdc) (sjt).
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement from Calipatria State Prison - Trust Office. (bdc)(sjt).
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dai Nguyen. (bdc)(sjt).
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dai Nguyen. (bdc) (sjt).
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 GO653A COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Barrio, D. Gray, K. Williams, D. Zepeda (Filing fee $ 402, Fee not paid, IFP filed.), filed by Dai Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:23-cv-1142-JO-KSC. Judge Jinsook Ohta and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (bdc). (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dai Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Barrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?