Corrales Jr. v. Dutschke et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Corrales Jr.
Defendant: Amy Dutschke, Deb Haaland and Bryan Newland
Case Number: 3:2023cv01876
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: David D Leshner
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706 Judicial Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Manuel Corrales Jr.. Amy Dutschke served. (Corrales, Manuel) (aas).
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Manuel Corrales Jr.. All Defendants served. (Corrales, Manuel) (aas).
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Manuel Corrales Jr.. Amy Dutschke, Deb Haaland, Bryan Newland served. (Corrales, Manuel) (aas).
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dim).
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dim)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amy Dutschke, Deb Haaland, Bryan Newland ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-18262983.), filed by Manuel Corrales Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:23-cv-1876-JLS-DDL. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case. (Corrales, Manuel)(dim) (anh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corrales Jr. v. Dutschke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Corrales Jr.
Represented By: Manuel Corrales, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Dutschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Newland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?