Jordan v. O'Malley
Plaintiff: Christopher Sean Jordan
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Case Number: 3:2024cv00349
Filed: February 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 id Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2024 Filing 8 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD . (Parker, Katherine)
April 16, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Oscar Gonzalez de Llano on behalf of Martin O'Malley (Gonzalez de Llano, Oscar)Attorney Oscar Gonzalez de Llano added to party Martin O'Malley(pty:dft)(jmo).
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. No. #2 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/22/2024. (jms)
March 18, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg is no longer assigned as presiding judge. Case reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24cv349-GPC-MSB.(no document attached) (sjt)
February 27, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Parker on behalf of Martin O'Malley (Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Martin O'Malley(pty:dft) (exs).
February 22, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Michael S. Berg has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel are hereby notified of plaintiff's right to consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Provided, as an attachment to this notice, is a consent/declination form for plaintiff to complete. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. The Notice of Electronic Filing of the complaint sent by the court to the Commissioner suffices for service of the complaint. The Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. (stn) (jmo).
February 22, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Sean Jordan. (stn) (jmo).
February 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin O'Malley (IFP Pending), filed by Christopher Sean Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:24-cv-349-MSB. Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg is assigned to the case. (Josephine M. Gerrard)(stn) Modified on 2/23/2024 to correct IFP status and regenerate (jmo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sean Jordan
Represented By: Josephine Mary Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Represented By: Social Security Administration Office of General C
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Represented By: Oscar Gonzalez de Llano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?