Kelly v. Secretary of CDCR et al
Petitioner: Russell J. Kelly
Respondent: Rob Bota and Secretary of CDCR
Case Number: 3:2024cv01233
Filed: July 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Denying Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #3 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 08/27/2024. (Petitioner Kelly served copy of order and a blank Southern District of California In Forma Pauperis application via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
August 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Russell J. Kelly. (bdc)
August 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Dismissing Case without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 08/09/2024.(Petitioner Kelly served copy of order and a blank Southern District of California In Forma Pauperis application via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
July 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Rob Bota, Secretary of CDCR (Filing fee $ 5, Fee Not Paid, IFP Not Filed.), filed by Russell J. Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:24-cv-1233-BAS-AHG. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(bdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Secretary of CDCR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rob Bota
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of CDCR
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Russell J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?