Asencio v. City of San Diego et al
Plaintiff: Eleonor Asencio
Defendant: State of California, San Ysidro California Border Patrol, Does 1 through 100, County of San Diego and General Services Administration
Case Number: 3:2024cv02074
Filed: November 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: David D Leshner
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 pi Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Motion to Dismiss Defendant City of San Diego Without Prejudice [Doc. #8 ] and Denying Defendants Motion to Dismiss As Moot [Doc. #5 ]. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 12/10/2024. (mjw)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party City of San Diego by Eleonor Asencio. (Ghermezian, Raymond) ***QC Mailer sent re: proposed order attached***(exs).
December 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Thomas J. Whelan Rejecting re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party . Non-compliance with local rule(s), The document has multiple problems. It violates Civil Local Rule 7.2.b. which requires any stipulation for which court approval is sought to be filed as a joint motion. It also violates Rule 7.2.c. which requires the proposed order to be filed as a document separate from the joint motion. In addition to the local rule violations, the documents pagination is out of order and the signature page for the judge (which should not be part of the joint motion) appears to have been taken from an unrelated document.. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 12/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Rejected Document)(exs)
December 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ECF NO. #7 ***Motion to Dismiss Defendant City of San Diego without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice of Dismissal)(Ghermezian, Raymond) ***QC Mailer sent re: proposed order attached*** (exs). (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/5/2024) (exs). Modified to strike on 12/5/2024 (exs).
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Defendant City of San Diego's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint(Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Notice Notice of Lodgment, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)(Ikeri, Daniel) (exs).
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint Responses due by 1/7/2025. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 11/7/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by General Services Administration, San Ysidro California Border Patrol re #2 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint (Dimbleby, Erin) (exs).
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Joint MOTION to Extend Time for Filing Response to Complaint (Dimbleby, Erin) (exs).
November 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405, Fee Waived), filed by State of California, City of San Diego, General Services Administration, San Ysidro California Border Patrol, County of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Info Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)The new case number is 3:24-cv-2074-W-DDL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case.(axc1) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asencio v. City of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleonor Asencio
Represented By: Raymond Ghermezian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Ysidro California Border Patrol
Represented By: Erin Dimbleby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Services Administration
Represented By: Erin Dimbleby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?