Campbell v. Skywest Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Allison Campbell
Defendant: Does 1 through 50 and Skywest Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv02141
Filed: November 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve B Chu
Referring Judge: Todd W Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 fl Removal- Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Presently before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, which is noticed for a hearing on February 20, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 14A before the Honorable Todd W. Robinson. Pursuant to Section III.B.2 of Judge Robinson's Standing Order for Civil Cases, Defendant SHALL FILE its opposition on or before January 16, 2025, and Plaintiff MAY FILE her optional reply, if any, on or before January 30, 2025. As noted in Section III.A.2 of Judge Robinson's Standing Order for Civil Cases, "[a]n opposing party's failure timely to file an opposition to any motion may be construed as consent to the granting of the motion pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(f)(3)(c)." (no document attached) (sjt)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Remand Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand Action to State Court by Allison Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Remand Case To State Court)(Rivapalacio, Victoria) (sjt).
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/28/2025 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2025 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Joint Discovery Plan due 1/21/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 11/20/2024.(sjt)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Bree Rivapalacio on behalf of Allison Campbell (Rivapalacio, Victoria)(sjt).
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine T. LeVu on behalf of Allison Campbell (LeVu, Christine)Attorney Christine T. LeVu added to party Allison Campbell(pty:pla) (sjt).
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesus Adolfo Sanchez Contreras on behalf of Allison Campbell (Sanchez Contreras, Jesus)Attorney Jesus Adolfo Sanchez Contreras added to party Allison Campbell(pty:pla) (sjt).
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Skywest Airlines, Inc. Identifying Corporate Parent SkyWest, Inc., Other Affiliate SkyWest Airlines Pilot Association, Other Affiliate SkyWest InFlight Association, Other Affiliate SkyWest Airlines Maintenance Association, Other Affiliate SkyWest Airlines Frontline Association for Skywest Airlines, Inc. (axi) (anh).
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Skywest Airlines, Inc. (axi)(anh).
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19353626.), filed by Skywest Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)The new case number is 3:24-cv-2141-TWR-SBC. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu are assigned to the case.(axi) (anh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Skywest Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skywest Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia T Craigie
Represented By: Amanda C Sommerfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Campbell
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Represented By: Norman B Blumenthal
Represented By: Nicholas James De Blouw
Represented By: Kyle R. Nordrehaug
Represented By: Aparajit Bhowmik
Represented By: Jesus Adolfo Sanchez Contreras
Represented By: Christine T. LeVu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?