Combs v. United States Government
Plaintiff: Patrick Davy Combs
Defendant: United States Government
Case Number: 3:2024cv02310
Filed: December 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7609 IRS: Petition to Quash IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss or Summarily Deny Petition to Quash and to Enforce IRS Summons by United States Government. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of IRS Revenue Officer)(Azer Habashi, Kelark)Attorney Kelark Azer Habashi added to party United States Government(pty:dft) (mef).
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule ( Responses due by 2/7/2025, Replies due by 2/14/2025., Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2025 01:30 PM before Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw.) Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/15/2025.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(bdc)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RESPONSE re #2 Order filed by Patrick Davy Combs. (bdc)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. Issued per request of Plaintiff. (bdc)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Requiring Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/30/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(bdc)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Summons by Patrick Davy Combs. (no document attached)(rxc) Modified on 12/13/2024 (rxc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Combs v. United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Government
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Kelark Azer Habashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Davy Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?