Galvez v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Mario Galvez
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Case Number: 3:2025cv00066
Filed: January 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lupe Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 wc Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Scheduling Order for Joint Motion for Judicial Review of Final Decision of The Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 03/10/2025.(mjw)
March 10, 2025 Filing 11 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD . (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Pages 1-60, #3 Pages 61-83, #4 Pages 84-190, #5 Pages 191-211, #6 Pages 212-295, #7 Pages 296-918, #8 Pages 919-1526, #9 Pages 1527-1693, #10 Pages 1694-1851, #11 Pages 1852-2085)(Parker, Katherine) (mef).
February 27, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Latstetter Dunn on behalf of Mario Galvez (Dunn, Jennifer)
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jennifer L. Dunn, re #4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 2/26/2025.(exs)
February 12, 2025 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER. Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr is no longer assigned as presiding judge. Case reassigned to District Judge Andrew G. Schopler and Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr for all further proceedings. The new case number is 25cv66-AGS-LR.(no document attached) (sjt)
January 29, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Parker on behalf of Carolyn Colvin (Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Carolyn Colvin(pty:dft) (rxc).
January 22, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Lookliss on behalf of Carolyn Colvin (Lookliss, Lori)Attorney Lori Lookliss added to party Carolyn Colvin(pty:dft) (rxc).
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Re Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Re ECF No. #2 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 1/13/2025. (rxc)
January 13, 2025 Filing 4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $224.00 receipt number ACASDC-19500288.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Dunn, Jennifer)(jrd)
January 13, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Lupe Rodriguez, Jr. has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel are hereby notified of plaintiff's right to consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Provided, as an attachment to this notice, is a consent/declination form for plaintiff to complete. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. The Notice of Electronic Filing of the complaint sent by the court to the Commissioner suffices for service of the complaint. The Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. (axi) (sjt).
January 13, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mario Galvez. (axi) (sjt).
January 13, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carolyn Colvin, IFP Filed, filed by Mario Galvez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint - Notice of Appeals Council Action)The new case number is 3:25-cv-66-LR. Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr. is assigned to the case. (Slocombe, Rachel)(axi) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galvez v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Lori Lookliss
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Galvez
Represented By: Rachel Viola Slocombe
Represented By: Jennifer Latstetter Dunn
Represented By: Jennifer Latstetter Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?