Pullman Arms, Inc., et al v. Healey

Plaintiff / Appellee: NATIONAL SHOOTING SPORTS FOUNDATION, INC., PAPER CITY FIREARMS, LLC, PULLMAN ARMS, INC., GRRR! GEAR, INC. and GUNS AND GEAR, LLC
Defendant / Appellant: MAURA T. HEALEY, Attorney General for the Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Case Number: -1313
Filed: April 18, 2018
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2018 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney David R. Kerrigan for Appellees Grrr! Gear, Inc., Guns and Gear, LLC, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Paper City Firearms, LLC and Pullman Arms, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 12/13/2018. [18-1331] (DRK) [Entered: 12/13/2018 09:02 AM]
December 6, 2018 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Julia Eleanor Kobick for Appellant Maura T. Healey. Certificate of service dated 12/06/2018. [18-1331] (JEK) [Entered: 12/06/2018 02:08 PM]
November 30, 2018 CASE calendared: Wednesday, 01/09/2019 AM Boston, MA Panel Courtroom. Designation form due 12/14/2018. [18-1331] (DT) [Entered: 11/30/2018 11:51 AM]
August 31, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [ # 6194655-2 ] submitted by Appellant Maura T. Healey. [18-1331] (LIM) [Entered: 09/05/2018 08:34 AM]
August 30, 2018 REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellant Maura T. Healey. Certificate of service dated 08/28/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 09/06/2018 . [18-1331] (AP) [Entered: 08/30/2018 10:38 AM]
August 28, 2018 BRIEF tendered by Appellant Maura T. Healey. [18-1331] (JEK) [Entered: 08/28/2018 04:17 PM]
August 7, 2018 Featured Case ORDER granting motion to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellant Maura T. Healey. Reply brief due 08/28/2018 for appellant Maura T. Healey. [18-1331] (MH) [Entered: 08/07/2018 10:47 AM]
August 7, 2018 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellant Maura T. Healey. Certificate of service dated 08/07/2018. [18-1331] (JEK) [Entered: 08/07/2018 08:32 AM]
August 6, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6187838-2 ] submitted by Appellees Grrr! Gear, Inc., Guns and Gear, LLC, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Paper City Firearms, LLC and Pullman Arms, Inc.. [18-1331] (LIM) [Entered: 08/08/2018 04:44 PM]
August 2, 2018 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Grrr! Gear, Inc., Guns and Gear, LLC, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Paper City Firearms, LLC and Pullman Arms, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 07/30/2018. [18-1331] (AMM) [Entered: 08/02/2018 10:03 AM]
August 2, 2018 APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellees Grrr! Gear, Inc., Guns and Gear, LLC, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Paper City Firearms, LLC and Pullman Arms, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 07/30/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 08/09/2018 . Reply brief due 08/13/2018 for APPELLANT Maura T. Healey. [18-1331] (AMM) [Entered: 08/02/2018 10:02 AM]
July 30, 2018 BRIEF tendered by Appellees Grrr! Gear, Inc., Guns and Gear, LLC, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Paper City Firearms, LLC and Pullman Arms, Inc.. [18-1331] (DRK) [Entered: 07/30/2018 04:33 PM]
July 12, 2018 Featured Case ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by appellees Pullman Arms, Inc., Guns and Gear, LLC, Paper City Firearms, LLC, Grrr! Gear, Inc. and National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. Brief due 07/30/2018 for appellees Grrr! Gear, Inc., Guns and Gear, LLC, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Paper City Firearms, LLC and Pullman Arms, Inc. [18-1331] (MH) [Entered: 07/12/2018 11:05 AM]
July 12, 2018 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Grrr! Gear, Inc., Guns and Gear, LLC, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Paper City Firearms, LLC and Pullman Arms, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 07/12/2018. [18-1331] (DRK) [Entered: 07/12/2018 09:43 AM]
June 27, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6177869-2 ] submitted by Appellant Maura T. Healey. [18-1331] (LIM) [Entered: 06/29/2018 10:11 AM]
June 27, 2018 APPENDIX filed by Appellant Maura T. Healey. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 06/18/2018. [18-1331] (AP) [Entered: 06/28/2018 09:54 AM]
June 20, 2018 PLEADING tendered: NINE (9) Paper copies filed [ # 6177869-2 ] by Appellant Maura T. Healey. [18-1331] (LIM) [Entered: 06/22/2018 08:30 AM]
June 18, 2018 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Maura T. Healey. Certificate of service dated 06/18/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 06/25/2018 . Brief due 07/18/2018 for APPELLEE Grrr! Gear, Inc., Guns and Gear, LLC, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Paper City Firearms, LLC and Pullman Arms, Inc. [18-1331] (AP) [Entered: 06/18/2018 04:44 PM]
June 18, 2018 BRIEF tendered by Appellant Maura T. Healey. [18-1331] (JEK) [Entered: 06/18/2018 03:10 PM]
May 8, 2018 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and appendix due 06/18/2018 for appellant Maura T. Healey. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief, and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [18-1331] (MH) [Entered: 05/08/2018 09:30 AM]
May 2, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Maura T. Healey filed by Attorney Julia E. Kobick. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2018. [18-1331] (JEK) [Entered: 05/02/2018 02:19 PM]
May 2, 2018 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Maura T. Healey indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2018. [18-1331] (WWP) [Entered: 05/02/2018 01:36 PM]
May 2, 2018 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Maura T. Healey. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2018. [18-1331] (WWP) [Entered: 05/02/2018 01:34 PM]
May 2, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Maura T. Healey filed by Attorney William W. Porter, Assistant Attorney General. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2018. [18-1331] (WWP) [Entered: 05/02/2018 01:32 PM]
April 30, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Grrr! Gear, Inc., Guns and Gear, LLC, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Paper City Firearms, LLC and Pullman Arms, Inc. filed by Attorney Christopher A. Kenney. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2018. [18-1331] (CAK) [Entered: 04/30/2018 10:44 AM]
April 27, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Grrr! Gear, Inc., Guns and Gear, LLC, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Paper City Firearms, LLC and Pullman Arms, Inc. filed by Attorney David R. Kerrigan. Certificate of service dated 04/27/2018. [18-1331] (DRK) [Entered: 04/27/2018 12:15 PM]
April 18, 2018 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #51) filed by Appellant Maura T. Healey. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 05/02/2018. [18-1331] (MH) [Entered: 04/18/2018 12:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pullman Arms, Inc., et al v. Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATIONAL SHOOTING SPORTS FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: David R. Kerrigan
Represented By: Michael J. Sullivan
Represented By: Christopher A. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PAPER CITY FIREARMS, LLC
Represented By: David R. Kerrigan
Represented By: Christopher A. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PULLMAN ARMS, INC.
Represented By: David R. Kerrigan
Represented By: Christopher A. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GRRR! GEAR, INC.
Represented By: David R. Kerrigan
Represented By: Christopher A. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GUNS AND GEAR, LLC
Represented By: David R. Kerrigan
Represented By: Christopher A. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MAURA T. HEALEY, Attorney General for the Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Collins
Represented By: William W. Porter
Represented By: Gary Klein
Represented By: Julia Eleanor Kobick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?