Worman, et al v. Baker, et al

Plaintiff: NICHOLAS ANDREW FELD
Defendant: MASSACHUSETTS STATE POLICE and CHARLES D. BAKER, in his official capacity as Governor of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Plaintiff / Appellant: JASON WILLIAM SAWYER, PAUL NELSON CHAMBERLAIN, DAVID SETH WORMAN, GUN OWNERS' ACTION LEAGUE, INC., OVERWATCH OUTPOST, ON TARGET TRAINING, INC. and ANTHONY LINDEN
Defendant / Appellee: MAURA T. HEALEY, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, DANIEL J. BENNETT, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the Executive Office of Public Safety and Security, RICHARD D. MCKEON, in his official capacity as Superintendent of the Massachusetts State Police, KERRY GILPIN, in her official capacity as Superintendent of the Massachusetts State Police and DANIEL JOHN BENNETT, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the Executive Office of Public Safety and Security
Amicus Curiae: PROFESSORS OF SECOND AMENDMENT LAW, INTERNATIONAL LAW ENFORCEMENT EDUCATORS AND TRAINERS ASSOCIATION, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LAW ENFORCEMENT FIREARMS INSTRUCTORS, CITIZENS COMMITTEE FOR THE RIGHT TO KEEP AND BEAR ARMS, WESTERN STATES SHERIFFS' ASSOCIATION, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC., CATO INSTITUTE, LAW ENFORCEMENT LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, MILLENNIAL POLICY CENTER, LAW ENFORCEMENT ALLIANCE OF AMERICA, INDEPENDENCE INSTITUTE, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION, LAW ENFORCEMENHT ACTION NETWORK, CRPA FOUNDATION, JEWS FOR THE PRESERVATION OF FIREARMS OWNERSHIP, JAMES M. MURRAY, ROYCE BARONDES, JOSEPH OLSON, GEORGE MOCSARY, GLENN REYNOLDS, DONALD KILMER, JOYCE MALCOLM, NICHOLAS JOHNSON, GREGORY WALLACE, MICHAEL O'SHEA, ROBERT COTTROL, RANDY BARNETT and GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Case Number: -1527
Filed: June 19, 2018
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 6205204-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [18-1545] (LIM) [Entered: 10/16/2018 03:09 PM]
October 15, 2018 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence in support of Appellee. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 10/22/2018 . [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 10/15/2018 09:45 AM]
October 11, 2018 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. Certificate of service dated 10/11/2018. [18-1545] (JKB) [Entered: 10/11/2018 11:58 AM]
October 10, 2018 SCALIA BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae James M. Murray. Number of copies: 1. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 10/10/2018 01:44 PM]
October 10, 2018 AMICUS REPLY BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae James M. Murray. Number of copies: 1. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 10/10/2018 01:42 PM]
October 10, 2018 Featured Case ORDER: Movant James Murray's motions for leave to file an amicus brief and amicus reply brief in support of appellees are granted. The tendered "Scalia Brief" and "Amicus Reply Brief" are hereby accepted for filing instanter. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 10/10/2018 01:24 PM]
September 28, 2018 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF tendered by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. [18-1545] (MTC) [Entered: 09/28/2018 01:07 PM]
September 28, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE filed by Attorney MARK T. CIANI. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2018. [18-1545] (MTC) [Entered: 09/28/2018 01:04 PM]
September 28, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE filed by Attorney JONATHAN K. BAUM. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2018. [18-1545] (JKB) [Entered: 09/28/2018 12:58 PM]
September 24, 2018 MOTION for leave to file amicus reply brief filed by Movant James M. Murray. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 09/26/2018 10:55 AM]
September 24, 2018 PLEADING tendered: ONE (1) Paper copy of Amicus Reply Brief filed by Movant James M. Murray. [18-1545] (LIM) [Entered: 09/25/2018 05:55 PM]
September 24, 2018 PLEADING tendered: ONE (1) Paper copy of Motion to File Amicus Brief and "Scalia" Brief (Amicus Brief) filed by Movant James M. Murray. [18-1545] (LIM) [Entered: 09/25/2018 05:46 PM]
September 21, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 6198494-2 ] submitted by Amici Curiae Randy Barnett, Royce Barondes, Cato Institute, Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms, Robert Cottrol, Independence Institute, Jews for the Preservation of Firearms Ownership, Nicholas Johnson, Donald Kilmer, Joyce Malcolm, Millennial Policy Center, George Mocsary, Michael O'Shea, Joseph Olson, Glenn Reynolds, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Gregory Wallace. [18-1545] (AMM) [Entered: 09/26/2018 01:28 PM]
September 21, 2018 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amici Curiae CRPA Foundation, International Association of Law Enforcement Firearms Instructors, International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Association, Law Enforcemenht Action Network, Law Enforcement Alliance of America, Law Enforcement Legal Defense Fund and Western States Sheriffs' Association. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2018. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 09/21/2018 02:12 PM]
September 21, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 6199541-2 ] submitted by Amici Curiae CRPA Foundation, International Association of Law Enforcement Firearms Instructors, International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Association, Law Enforcemenht Action Network, Law Enforcement Alliance of America, Law Enforcement Legal Defense Fund and Western States Sheriffs' Association. [18-1545] (AMM) [Entered: 09/21/2018 11:14 AM]
September 20, 2018 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae CRPA Foundation, International Association of Law Enforcement Firearms Instructors, International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Association, Law Enforcemenht Action Network, Law Enforcement Alliance of America, Law Enforcement Legal Defense Fund and Western States Sheriffs' Association. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 09/27/2018 . [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 09/20/2018 10:54 AM]
September 20, 2018 Featured Case ORDER granting motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Western States Sheriffs' Association, Law Enforcement Legal Defense Fund, Law Enforcement Action Network, International Association of Law Enforcement Firearms Instructors, CRPA Foundation, International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Association, and the Law Enforcement Alliance of America's. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 09/20/2018 10:44 AM]
September 19, 2018 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Connor M. Blair for Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., David Seth Worman, Anthony Linden, Jason William Sawyer, Paul Nelson Chamberlain, On Target Training, Inc. and Overwatch Outpost. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 09/19/2018 03:31 PM]
September 19, 2018 Featured Case ORDER entered by William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge granting motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by National Rifle Association. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 09/19/2018 09:10 AM]
September 17, 2018 PLEADING tendered: ONE (1) Paper copy of 'Scalia Brief' (Amicus Curiae brief) filed by Movant James M. Murray. [18-1545] (LIM) [Entered: 09/17/2018 04:08 PM]
September 17, 2018 MOTION for leave to file a provisional amicus curiae brief in support of filed by Movant James M. Murray. Certificate of service was not included. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 09/17/2018 03:39 PM]
September 17, 2018 Featured Case ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Maura T. Healey, Daniel John Bennett and Kerry Gilpin. Brief due 11/05/2018 for appellee Daniel John Bennett, Kerry Gilpin and Maura T. Healey. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 09/17/2018 11:22 AM]
September 17, 2018 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae Randy Barnett, Royce Barondes, Cato Institute, Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms, Robert Cottrol, Independence Institute, Jews for the Preservation of Firearms Ownership, Nicholas Johnson, Donald Kilmer, Joyce Malcolm, Millennial Policy Center, George Mocsary, Michael O'Shea, Joseph Olson, Glenn Reynolds, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Gregory Wallace in support of Appellant. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 09/24/2018 . [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 09/17/2018 11:15 AM]
September 14, 2018 MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Daniel John Bennett, Maura T. Healey and Kerry Gilpin. Certificate of service dated 09/14/2018. [18-1545] (JEK) [Entered: 09/14/2018 04:34 PM]
September 12, 2018 Featured Case ORDER denying denying without prejudice motion to file amicus curiae brief filed by Movant James M. Murray. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 09/12/2018 01:19 PM]
September 5, 2018 REPLY filed by Movant National Rifle Association to response [ # 6195486-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 09/05/2018. [18-1545] (DHT) [Entered: 09/05/2018 07:06 PM]
September 4, 2018 RESPONSE filed by Appellees Daniel J. Bennett, Maura T. Healey and Kerry Gilpin to motion [ # 6194435-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 09/04/2018. [18-1545] (JEK) [Entered: 09/04/2018 04:27 PM]
August 31, 2018 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Movant James M. Murray. Certificate of service was not included. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 09/04/2018 03:12 PM]
August 31, 2018 NOTICE regarding motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Movant James M. Murray. Certificate of service was not included. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 09/04/2018 02:43 PM]
August 30, 2018 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Amici Curiae Cato Institute, Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms, Independence Institute, Jews for the Preservation of Firearms Ownership, Millennial Policy Center and Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2018. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 08/30/2018 02:40 PM]
August 30, 2018 PLEADING tendered: Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Amici Curiae Cato Institute, Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms, Independence Institute, Jews for the Preservation of Firearms Ownership, Millennial Policy Center, Professors of Second Amendment Law and Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2018. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 08/30/2018 02:26 PM]
August 30, 2018 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Joseph Greenlee for Amici Curiae Second Amendment Foundation, Cato Institute, Professors of Second Amendment Law, Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms, Jews for the Preservation of Firearms Ownership, Independence Institute and Millennial Policy Center. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2018. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 08/30/2018 02:23 PM]
August 30, 2018 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Dan M. Peterson for Movants Law Enforcement Legal Defense Fund, Law Enforcemenht Action Network, International Association of Law Enforcement Firearms Instructors, International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Association, Law Enforcement Alliance of America, Western States Sheriffs' Association and CRPA Foundation. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2018. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 08/30/2018 11:41 AM]
August 30, 2018 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Movants CRPA Foundation, International Association of Law Enforcement Firearms Instructors, International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Association, Law Enforcemenht Action Network, Law Enforcement Alliance of America, Law Enforcement Legal Defense Fund and Western States Sheriffs' Association. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2018. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 08/30/2018 11:34 AM]
August 29, 2018 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Appellant filed by Movant(s) "WESTERN STATES SHERIFFS ASSOCIATION, et al". Certificate of service dated 08/29/2018. [18-1545] (DMP) [Entered: 08/29/2018 11:46 PM]
August 29, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Professors of Second Amendment Law, Cato Institute, Second Amendment Foundation, Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms, Jews for the Preservation of Firearms Ownership, Independence Institute, & Millennial Policy Center filed by Attorney Joseph G.S. Greenlee. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2018. [18-1545] (JG) [Entered: 08/29/2018 04:51 PM]
August 29, 2018 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Movant National Rifle Association. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2018. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 08/29/2018 01:31 PM]
August 29, 2018 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Appellant filed by Movant(s) National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2018. [18-1545] (DHT) [Entered: 08/29/2018 01:18 PM]
August 29, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) National Rifle Association of America, Inc. filed by Attorney John D. Ohlendorf. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2018. [18-1545] (JO) [Entered: 08/29/2018 01:10 PM]
August 29, 2018 JOINT APPENDIX filed by Appellants Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman. Number of volumes: 8. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 08/22/2018. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 08/29/2018 01:06 PM]
August 29, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) National Rifle Association of America, Inc. filed by Attorney Peter A. Patterson. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2018. [18-1545] (PAP) [Entered: 08/29/2018 12:43 PM]
August 29, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) National Rifle Association of America, Inc. filed by Attorney David H. Thompson. Certificate of service dated 08/29/2018. [18-1545] (DHT) [Entered: 08/29/2018 12:40 PM]
August 27, 2018 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6192905-2 ] submitted by Appellants Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman. [18-1545] (LIM) [Entered: 08/28/2018 09:21 AM]
August 24, 2018 PLEADING tendered: Copy of letter sent to Attorney James M. Campbell seeking to file a amicus curiae brief filed by not party James Murray . Certificate of service was not included. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 08/27/2018 08:59 AM]
August 24, 2018 CERTIFICATE of service for pleading tendered [6193423-2] filed by Appellants Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman. Certificate of service dated 08/22/2018. [18-1545] (JPS) [Entered: 08/24/2018 03:39 PM]
August 24, 2018 PLEADING tendered: APPENDIX filed by Appellants Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman. Number of volumes: 8. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service was not included. [18-1545] (AP) [Entered: 08/24/2018 11:21 AM]
August 23, 2018 NOTICE issued. After 09/06/2018, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Connor M. Blair for Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., David Seth Worman, Anthony Linden, Jason William Sawyer, Paul Nelson Chamberlain, On Target Training, Inc. and Overwatch Outpost and Marc A. Nardone for Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., David Seth Worman, Anthony Linden, Jason William Sawyer, Paul Nelson Chamberlain, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost and Nicholas Andrew Feld. [18-1545] (CP) [Entered: 08/23/2018 04:11 PM]
August 22, 2018 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman. [18-1545] (AP) [Entered: 08/22/2018 04:45 PM]
August 22, 2018 APPELLANTS' BRIEF filed by Appellants Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman. Certificate of service dated 08/22/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 08/29/2018 . Brief due 09/21/2018 for APPELLEE Daniel J. Bennett, Kerry Gilpin, Maura T. Healey and Richard D. McKeon. [18-1545] (AP) [Entered: 08/22/2018 04:42 PM]
August 22, 2018 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman. [18-1545] (JPS) [Entered: 08/22/2018 02:10 PM]
August 2, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants David Seth Worman, Anthony Linden, Jason William Sawyer, Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., On Target Training, Inc. and Overwatch Outpost filed by Attorney James W. Porter, III. Certificate of service dated 08/02/2018. [18-1545] (JWP) [Entered: 08/02/2018 12:10 PM]
August 2, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Overwatch Outpost, David Seth Worman, Anthony Linden, Jason William Sawyer and On Target Training, Inc. filed by Attorney Tara Sky Woodward. Certificate of service dated 08/02/2018. [18-1545] (TSW) [Entered: 08/02/2018 12:06 PM]
July 31, 2018 PLEADING tendered: Letter regarding amicus brief and request for docket sheet filed by James Murray. [18-1545]. (GA) [Entered: 08/03/2018 03:47 PM]
July 19, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Daniel J. Bennett, Kerry Gilpin and Maura T. Healey filed by Attorney Julia E. Kobick. Certificate of service dated 07/19/2018. [18-1545] (JEK) [Entered: 07/19/2018 10:18 AM]
July 16, 2018 NOTICE issued. After 07/30/2018, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Connor M. Blair for Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., David Seth Worman, Anthony Linden, Jason William Sawyer, Paul Nelson Chamberlain, On Target Training, Inc. and Overwatch Outpost, Marc A. Nardone for Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., David Seth Worman, Anthony Linden, Jason William Sawyer, Paul Nelson Chamberlain, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost and Nicholas Andrew Feld, James W. Porter for Massachusetts State Police and Nicholas Andrew Feld and T. Sky Woodward for Nicholas Andrew Feld. [18-1545] (GA) [Entered: 07/16/2018 03:21 PM]
July 13, 2018 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 08/22/2018 for appellant Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman. Appendix due 08/22/2018 for appellant Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [18-1545] (GA) [Entered: 07/13/2018 12:24 PM]
July 13, 2018 Featured Case ORDER entered: Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2), it is hereby ordered that Kerry Gilpin, in her official capacity as Superintendent of the Massachusetts State Police be substituted for Richard D. McKeon, in his official capacity as Superintendent of the Massachusetts State Police as a defendant-appellee. [18-1545] (GA) [Entered: 07/13/2018 12:18 PM]
July 3, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman filed by Attorney James M. Campbell. Certificate of service dated 07/03/2018. [18-1545] (JMC) [Entered: 07/03/2018 10:53 AM]
July 3, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants David Seth Worman, Anthony Linden, Jason William Sawyer, Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., On Target Training, Inc. and Overwatch Outpost filed by Attorney Richard P. Campbell. Certificate of service dated 07/03/2018. [18-1545] (RPC) [Entered: 07/03/2018 10:42 AM]
July 2, 2018 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 07/02/2018. [18-1545] (JPS) [Entered: 07/02/2018 02:27 PM]
July 2, 2018 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman. Certificate of service dated 07/02/2018. [18-1545] (JPS) [Entered: 07/02/2018 02:23 PM]
July 2, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman filed by Attorney John Parker Sweeney. Certificate of service dated 07/02/2018. [18-1545] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS. (JPS) [Entered: 07/02/2018 02:20 PM]
July 2, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman filed by Attorney John Parker Sweeney. Certificate of service dated 07/02/2018. [18-1545] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS. (JPS) [Entered: 07/02/2018 02:18 PM]
July 2, 2018 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman filed by Attorney John Parker Sweeney. Certificate of service dated 07/02/2018. [18-1545] (JPS) [Entered: 07/02/2018 02:10 PM]
June 19, 2018 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #100) filed by Appellants Paul Nelson Chamberlain, Gun Owners' Action League, Inc., Anthony Linden, On Target Training, Inc., Overwatch Outpost, Jason William Sawyer and David Seth Worman. Docketing Statement due 07/03/2018. Transcript Report/Order form due 07/03/2018. Appearance form due 07/03/2018. [18-1545] (GA) [Entered: 06/19/2018 12:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worman, et al v. Baker, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASSACHUSETTS STATE POLICE
Represented By: James W. Porter
Represented By: Gary Klein
Represented By: Julia Eleanor Kobick
Represented By: James Wallace Porter III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES D. BAKER, in his official capacity as Governor of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: William W. Porter
Represented By: Gary Klein
Represented By: Julia Eleanor Kobick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS ANDREW FELD
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: James W. Porter
Represented By: Richard Paul Campbell
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: James Michael Campbell
Represented By: Tara Sky Woodward
Represented By: James Wallace Porter III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JASON WILLIAM SAWYER
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: Connor M. Blair
Represented By: James W. Porter
Represented By: Richard Paul Campbell
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: James Michael Campbell
Represented By: Tara Sky Woodward
Represented By: James Wallace Porter III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAUL NELSON CHAMBERLAIN
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: Connor M. Blair
Represented By: James W. Porter
Represented By: Richard Paul Campbell
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: James Michael Campbell
Represented By: Tara Sky Woodward
Represented By: James Wallace Porter III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID SETH WORMAN
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: Connor M. Blair
Represented By: James W. Porter
Represented By: Richard Paul Campbell
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: James Michael Campbell
Represented By: Tara Sky Woodward
Represented By: James Wallace Porter III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GUN OWNERS' ACTION LEAGUE, INC.
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: Connor M. Blair
Represented By: James W. Porter
Represented By: Richard Paul Campbell
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: James Michael Campbell
Represented By: Tara Sky Woodward
Represented By: James Wallace Porter III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OVERWATCH OUTPOST
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: Connor M. Blair
Represented By: James W. Porter
Represented By: Richard Paul Campbell
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: James Michael Campbell
Represented By: Tara Sky Woodward
Represented By: James Wallace Porter III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ON TARGET TRAINING, INC.
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: Connor M. Blair
Represented By: James W. Porter
Represented By: Richard Paul Campbell
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: James Michael Campbell
Represented By: Tara Sky Woodward
Represented By: James Wallace Porter III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY LINDEN
Represented By: T. Sky Woodward
Represented By: Connor M. Blair
Represented By: James W. Porter
Represented By: Richard Paul Campbell
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: James Michael Campbell
Represented By: Tara Sky Woodward
Represented By: James Wallace Porter III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAURA T. HEALEY, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: William W. Porter
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Collins
Represented By: Gary Klein
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Represented By: Julia Eleanor Kobick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL J. BENNETT, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the Executive Office of Public Safety and Security
Represented By: William W. Porter
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Collins
Represented By: Gary Klein
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Represented By: Julia Eleanor Kobick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD D. MCKEON, in his official capacity as Superintendent of the Massachusetts State Police
Represented By: William W. Porter
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Collins
Represented By: Gary Klein
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Represented By: Julia Eleanor Kobick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KERRY GILPIN, in her official capacity as Superintendent of the Massachusetts State Police
Represented By: William W. Porter
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Collins
Represented By: Gary Klein
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Represented By: Julia Eleanor Kobick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL JOHN BENNETT, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the Executive Office of Public Safety and Security
Represented By: William W. Porter
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Collins
Represented By: Gary Klein
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Represented By: Julia Eleanor Kobick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PROFESSORS OF SECOND AMENDMENT LAW
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNATIONAL LAW ENFORCEMENT EDUCATORS AND TRAINERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Dan M. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LAW ENFORCEMENT FIREARMS INSTRUCTORS
Represented By: Dan M. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITIZENS COMMITTEE FOR THE RIGHT TO KEEP AND BEAR ARMS
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WESTERN STATES SHERIFFS' ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Dan M. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CATO INSTITUTE
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAW ENFORCEMENT LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: Dan M. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MILLENNIAL POLICY CENTER
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAW ENFORCEMENT ALLIANCE OF AMERICA
Represented By: Dan M. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INDEPENDENCE INSTITUTE
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: John Ohlendorf
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAW ENFORCEMENHT ACTION NETWORK
Represented By: Dan M. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CRPA FOUNDATION
Represented By: Dan M. Peterson
Represented By: Anna M. Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel
Represented By: Sean A. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JEWS FOR THE PRESERVATION OF FIREARMS OWNERSHIP
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES M. MURRAY
Represented By: James M. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROYCE BARONDES
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOSEPH OLSON
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GEORGE MOCSARY
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GLENN REYNOLDS
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DONALD KILMER
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOYCE MALCOLM
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NICHOLAS JOHNSON
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GREGORY WALLACE
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL O'SHEA
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBERT COTTROL
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RANDY BARNETT
Represented By: Matthew Larosiere
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Represented By: David B. Kopel
Represented By: Trevor Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Mark T. Ciani
Represented By: Jonathan K. Baum
Represented By: Hannah Shearer
Represented By: J. Adams Skaggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?