Denmark v. Liberty Life, et al

:
Plaintiff - Appellant: DIANE DENMARK
Defendant - Appellee: LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE CO. OF BOSTON, Assurance Company of Boston and GENRAD, INC. LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN
Case Number: 05-2877
Filed: December 21, 2005
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Empl. Ret. Inc. Security Act

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
March 28, 2007 Denmark v. Liberty Life, et al
April 9, 2007 Denmark v. Liberty Life, et al
July 2, 2008 Denmark v. Liberty Life, et al
May 6, 2009 Denmark v. Liberty Life, et al
June 3, 2009 Denmark v. Liberty Life, et al

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2009 920090603 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
May 6, 2009 920090506 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
July 2, 2008 920080702 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
April 9, 2007 920070409 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
March 28, 2007 920070328 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
Search for this case: Denmark v. Liberty Life, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By: Eugene R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: DIANE DENMARK
Represented By: Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE CO. OF BOSTON, Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Ashley B. Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: GENRAD, INC. LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN
Represented By: Ashley B. Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?