US v. Vega-Santiago

Appellee: UNITED STATES
Defendant - Appellant: MANUEL VEGA-SANTIAGO
Case Number: 06-1558
Filed: April 3, 2006
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
October 31, 2007 US v. Vega-Santiago
February 21, 2008 US v. Vega-Santiago
March 7, 2008 US v. Vega-Santiago
April 2, 2008 US v. Vega-Santiago

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2008 920080402 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
March 7, 2008 920080307 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
February 21, 2008 920080221 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
October 31, 2007 920071031 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
Search for this case: US v. Vega-Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Antonio R. Bazan-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: MANUEL VEGA-SANTIAGO
Represented By: Johnny Rivera-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?