US v. DeCologero, et al

Appellee: UNITED STATES
Defendant - Appellant: JOHN P. DECOLOGERO and PAUL J. DECOLOGERO
Case Number: 07-1278
Filed: February 15, 2007
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
May 23, 2007 US v. DeCologero, et al
June 15, 2007 US v. DeCologero, et al
June 23, 2008 US v. DeCologero, et al
July 14, 2008 US v. DeCologero, et al

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2008 920080714 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
June 23, 2008 920080623 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
June 15, 2007 920070615 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
May 23, 2007 920070523 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
Search for this case: US v. DeCologero, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Timothy Q. Feeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: JOHN P. DECOLOGERO
Represented By: Jean Cullnan LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: PAUL J. DECOLOGERO
Represented By: Jeanne M. Kempthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?