US v. Textron Inc.

Petitioner - Appellant: UNITED STATES
Respondent - Appellee: TEXTRON INC.
Amicus Curiae: CLAUDINE PEASE-WINGENTER
:
Case Number: 07-2631
Filed: October 31, 2007
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: IRS - Third Party 26 USC 7609

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
January 21, 2009 US v. Textron Inc.
January 28, 2009 US v. Textron Inc.
August 13, 2009 US v. Textron Inc.
August 24, 2009 US v. Textron Inc.
September 14, 2009 US v. Textron Inc.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2009 920090914 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
August 24, 2009 920090824 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
August 13, 2009 920090813 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
January 28, 2009 920090128 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
January 21, 2009 920090121 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
Search for this case: US v. Textron Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner - appellant: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Thomas P. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent - appellee: TEXTRON INC.
Represented By: Arthur L. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CLAUDINE PEASE-WINGENTER
Represented By: Claudine Pease-Wingenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By: Alan I. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?