Ligeri v. YouTube, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant: BENJAMIN LIGERI
Defendant - Appellee: YOUTUBE and GOOGLE, INC.
Case Number: 09-1071
Filed: January 27, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2009 Record returned to originating court:. Docs. 1-21, transcript 23, [09-1071] (CC)
September 9, 2009 30 MANDATE Issued. [09-1071] (ELW)
September 8, 2009 29 Featured Case ORDER entered by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge and Jeffrey R. Howard, Appellate Judge denying motion for written decision filed by Appellant Benjamin Ligeri. [09-1071] (ELW)
August 27, 2009 28 LETTER sent to Appellant Benjamin Ligeri regarding the Notice of Appeal to US Supreme Court that was sent to the Court of Appeals. [09-1071] (ELW)
August 26, 2009 27 LETTER filed by Party Benjamin Ligeri appealing to the Supreme Court. Certificate of service was not included. [09-1071] (ELW)
August 26, 2009 26 PRO SE MOTION filed by Appellant Benjamin Ligeri requesting a transcript of the proceedings, a copy of the reviewed material and a written explanation. Certificate of service was not included. [09-1071] (ELW)
June 30, 2009 24 Case submitted. Panel: Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge; Jeffrey R. Howard, Appellate Judge. [09-1071] (LM)
June 5, 2009 Public docket note: A copy of the appellant's PRO SE Reply brief has been sent to Attorney Michael Berta for the appellees. [09-1071] (ELW)
June 4, 2009 PRO SE REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellant Benjamin Ligeri. Length: 15 pages. Copies: 3. Certificate of service dated. [09-1071] (ELW)
June 4, 2009 PLEADING Tendered: Reply Brief (3 copies) filed by Appellant Benjamin Ligeri. Certificate of service was not included. [09-1071] (BLC)
May 28, 2009 20 ELECTRONIC Document containing Appellee's Brief filed by Appellees Google, Inc. and YouTube. [09-1071] (ELW)
May 27, 2009 19 Featured Case ORDER granting motion to file an appendix filed by Appellees Google, Inc. and YouTube. [09-1071] (ELW)
May 22, 2009 APPENDIX filed by Appellees Google, Inc. and YouTube. Volumes: 1. Copies: 5. Certificate of service dated mailed 05/21/2009. [09-1071] (ELW)
May 22, 2009 17 MOTION filed by Appellees Google, Inc. and YouTube for leave to file appendix. Certificate of service dated 05/21/2009. [09-1071] (ELW)
May 22, 2009 PLEADING Tendered: appendix (5 copies) filed by Appellees Google, Inc. and YouTube. Certificate of service (mailed) dated 05/21/2009. [09-1071] (RL)
May 22, 2009 NON-CONFORMING ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT containing brief filed by Appellees Google, Inc. and YouTube. [09-1071] (RL)
May 22, 2009 14 DISCLOSURE Statement on behalf of Appellees Google, Inc. and YouTube filed. [09-1071] (RL)
May 22, 2009 BRIEF filed by Appellees Google, Inc. and YouTube. Length: 13 pages. Copies: 9. Certificate of service (mailed) dated 05/21/2009. Reply brief due 06/08/2009 for Appellant Benjamin Ligeri. [09-1071] (RL)
May 12, 2009 12 Featured Case ORDER directing Appellees Google, Inc. and YouTube to file a conforming brief and appendix. Brief due 05/26/2009. [09-1071] (ELW)
May 11, 2009 NON-CONFORMING APPENDIX filed by Appellees Google, Inc. and YouTube. Certificate of service (mailed) dated 05/08/2009. [09-1071] (RL)
May 11, 2009 NON-CONFORMING BRIEF filed by Appellees Google, Inc. and YouTube. Certificate of service (mailed) dated 05/08/2009. [09-1071] (RL)
April 15, 2009 TRANSCRIPT filed. Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 12/30/2008, Type of Proceeding: motion hearing, Court Reporter: Hancock, Brenda Kay. [09-1071] (TS)
April 15, 2009 SUPPLEMENTAL Record filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Doc. No. 23 (Transcript). [09-1071] (TS)
April 3, 2009 7 BRIEF filed by Appellant Benjamin Ligeri. Length: 5 pages. Copies: 2. Certificate of service dated. Brief due 05/08/2009 for Appellee Google, Inc. and Appellee YouTube. [09-1071] (ELW)
March 20, 2009 6 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued directing appellant to file a brief or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 45.0(a). Brief due 04/03/2009. [09-1071] (ELW)
February 4, 2009 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Michael A. Berta and Anne Marie Nicpon for Appellees Google, Inc. and YouTube. [09-1071] (MH)
January 29, 2009 4 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 03/10/2009 for Appellant Benjamin Ligeri. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [09-1071] (MH)
January 27, 2009 NOTICE of Filing Transcript. Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 12/30/2008 motion hearing, Court Reporter: Hancock, Brenda. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript(s) will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. Transcript(s) due 04/13/2009 from Court Reporter Brenda Hancock. [09-1071] (MH)
January 27, 2009 RECORD filed. Comments: docs #1-21. [09-1071] (MH)
January 27, 2009 1 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #21) filed by Appellant Benjamin Ligeri. Opening forms sent. Transcript Report/Order form due 02/10/2009. Fee due 02/10/2009. [09-1071] (MH)

Search for this case: Ligeri v. YouTube, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: BENJAMIN LIGERI
Represented By: Benjamin Ligeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: YOUTUBE
Represented By: Michael A. Berta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: GOOGLE, INC.
Represented By: Michael A. Berta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?