Sony BMG Music Entertainment, et al v. Tenenbaum Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant: SONY BMG MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, a Delaware general partnership, WARNER BROS RECORDS INC, a Deleware Corporation, ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation, ARISTA RECORDS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company and UMG RECORDINGS INC., a Delaware corporation
Defendant - Appellee: JOEL TENENBAUM
Amicus Curiae: THE NASHVILLE SONGWRITERS ASSOCIATION INTERNATIONAL, SONGWRITERS GUILD OF AMERICA, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TELEVISION AND RADIO ARTISTS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, BERKMAN CENTER FOR INTERNET & SOCIETY AT HARVARD LAW SCHOOL and FREE SOFTWARE FOUNDATION
Intervenor: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 10-1883
Filed: July 27, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Copyrights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 16, 2011 Summary Sony BMG Music Entertainment, et al v. Tenenbaum
October 5, 2011 Sony BMG Music Entertainment, et al v. Tenenbaum

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2011 CASE argued. Panel: Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge. Arguing attorneys: Julie A. Ahrens for Electronic Frontier Foundation, Paul D. Clement for UMG Recordings Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Bros Records Inc and Arista Records, LLC, Charles R. Nesson for Joel Tenenbaum and Jeffrey A. Clair for US, Jason S. Harrow for Joel Tenenbaum. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (LM)
March 29, 2011 Filing 68 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Julie A. Ahrens arguing for Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (LM)
March 29, 2011 Filing 67 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Julie A. Ahrens for Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (LM)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting motion for leave to file notice of appearance filed by Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (LM)
March 28, 2011 Filing 65 MOTION requesting leave for Attorney Julie A. Ahrens to enter an appearance filed by Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (JAA)
March 25, 2011 Filing 64 CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 03/25/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (CRN)
March 25, 2011 Filing 63 LETTER regarding Division of Argument Time filed by Attorney Charles R. Nesson for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 03/25/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (CRN)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge denying motion for oral argument filed by Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052, denying motion for oral argument filed by intervenor US in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
March 18, 2011 Filing 61 MOTION for oral argument filed by Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in 10-1883. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (MB)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge granting in part motion to amend caption filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees UMG Recordings Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Bros Records Inc and Arista Records, LLC. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
March 7, 2011 Filing 59 MOTION for oral argument filed by Not Party US in 10-1883, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (JAC)
March 7, 2011 Filing 58 CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Not Party US in 10-1883, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (JAC)
March 7, 2011 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of service for designation form [5531416-2] filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2011. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947] (CRN)
March 7, 2011 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE of service for designation form [5531415-2] filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2011. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947] (CRN)
March 7, 2011 Filing 55 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Jason S. Harrow for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2011. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947] (CRN)
March 7, 2011 Filing 54 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Charles R. Nesson for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2011. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947] (CRN)
March 3, 2011 Filing 53 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Jason S. Harrow for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge granting motion for leave to file appearance form filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
March 2, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION to amend caption filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947, Not Parties Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 03/02/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (PDC)
February 25, 2011 Filing 50 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Paul D. Clement for Appellants/Cross-Appellees UMG Recordings Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Bros Records Inc and Arista Records, LLC in 10-1883, 10-1947, Attorney Paul D. Clement for Not Parties UMG Recordings Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Bros Records Inc and Arista Records, LLC in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (PDC)
February 25, 2011 Filing 49 DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Jeffrey A. Clair for Not Party US in 10-1883, Attorney Jeffrey A. Clair for Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (JAC)
February 25, 2011 Filing 48 SUPPLEMENT in support of MOTION for leave to allow law student to file an appearance form [45] filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
February 25, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [47] submitted by. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
February 23, 2011 Filing 46 CASE calendared: 04/04/2011 Boston, MA Panel Courtroom. Designation form due 03/09/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (LM)
February 18, 2011 Filing 45 REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 02/17/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/25/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
February 17, 2011 Filing 44 BRIEF tendered by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 02/17/2011. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947] (CRN)
February 17, 2011 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to allow law student to file an appearance form filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
February 1, 2011 ELEVEN (11) paper copies of reply brief [5522836-2] submitted by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
February 1, 2011 Filing 41 REPLY/RESPONSE BRIEF filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1947, Not Parties Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 01/31/2011. Reply brief due 02/17/2011 for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/08/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
January 31, 2011 Filing 40 BRIEF tendered by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947, Not Parties Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 01/31/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (PDC)
January 28, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [5521646-2] submitted by Not Party US in 10-1883, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
January 26, 2011 Filing 38 REPLY/RESPONSE BRIEF filed by Not Party US in 10-1883, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 01/26/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/02/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
January 26, 2011 Filing 37 BRIEF tendered by Not Party US in 10-1883, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 01/26/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (JAC)
January 10, 2011 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [5517055-2] submitted by Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
January 6, 2011 Filing 35 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052 in support of Appellee. Certificate of service dated 01/03/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 01/13/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
January 6, 2011 Filing 34 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Michael Barclay for Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
January 3, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Appellee filed by Movant(s) Electronic Frontier Foundation. Certificate of service dated 01/03/2011. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (MB)
December 27, 2010 Filing 31 APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Number of copies: 10. Certificate of service dated 12/27/2010. Reply brief due 01/31/2011 for Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc., Warner Bros Records Inc and United States [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
December 27, 2010 Filing 30 BRIEF tendered by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 12/27/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (CRN)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and/or appendix filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum. Brief due 12/27/2010 for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum. [10-1947, 10-1883, 10-2052] (AS)
November 4, 2010 Filing 28 MOTION to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1947, 10-1883, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 11/04/2010. [10-1947, 10-1883, 10-2052] (CRN)
November 2, 2010 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [5499367-2] submitted by Not Party US in 10-1883, Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
October 29, 2010 Filing 26 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947, 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 10/29/2010. Brief due 12/02/2010 for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum. Appellant/Cross-Appellee is directed to submit nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief so that they are received by the court on or before 11/05/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
October 29, 2010 Filing 25 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
October 29, 2010 Filing 24 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947. Number of copies: 9. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
October 29, 2010 Filing 23 BRIEF tendered by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947, Not Parties Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 10/29/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (PDC)
October 29, 2010 Filing 22 BRIEF tendered by Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 10/29/2010. [10-2052, 10-1883] (JAC)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER directing Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052 to file a conforming brief. Brief due 11/10/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
October 28, 2010 JOINT APPENDIX filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc., Warner Bros Records Inc and Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883, Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1947. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
October 28, 2010 PLEADING tendered: Paper Copies of Appellants' Brief (9) filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (BLC)
October 27, 2010 Filing 18 BRIEF tendered by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947, Not Parties Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052]--[Edited 10/28/2010 by BLC] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS. RE-FILE DUE DATE NOVEMBER 1, 2010 (11/1/10) [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (JSB)
October 27, 2010 Filing 17 BRIEF tendered by Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2010. [10-2052, 10-1883] (JAC)
October 7, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947, Not Parties Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-2052 filed by Attorney Jeffrey S. Bucholtz. Certificate of service dated 10/07/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (JSB)
October 7, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants/Cross-Appellees Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-1883, 10-1947, Not Parties Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc in 10-2052 filed by Attorney Paul D. Clement. Certificate of service dated 10/07/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (PDC)
September 28, 2010 Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-2052 indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2010. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947]--[Edited 09/28/2010 by AS] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (JAC)
September 28, 2010 Filing 13 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-2052. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2010. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947]--[Edited 09/28/2010 by AS] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (JAC)
September 28, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-2052 filed by Attorney Jeffrey Clair. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2010. [10-2052, 10-1883, 10-1947] (JAC)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER consolidating cases for purposes of briefing and oral argument. The following case(s) are consolidated: 10-2052 (Consolidated started 09/17/2010) with 10-1883; extending time to file brief and appendix. Brief due 10/27/2010 for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Arista Records, LLC, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Atlantic Recording Corporation, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Appellant/Cross-Appellee UMG Recordings Inc., Appellant/Cross-Appellee Warner Bros Records Inc and Appellant/Cross-Appellee United States. Appendix due 10/27/2010 for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Arista Records, LLC, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Atlantic Recording Corporation, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Appellant/Cross-Appellee UMG Recordings Inc., Appellant/Cross-Appellee Warner Bros Records Inc and Appellant/Cross-Appellee United States. [10-1883, 10-1947, 10-2052] (AS)
August 31, 2010 Filing 10 CROSS-APPEAL briefing schdule set pursuant to F.R.A.P. 28.1. Brief due 10/12/2010 for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Arista Records, LLC, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Atlantic Recording Corporation, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Appellant/Cross-Appellee UMG Recordings Inc., Appellant/Cross-Appellee Warner Bros Records Inc and Appellant/Cross-Appellee United States. Appendix due 10/12/2010 for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Arista Records, LLC, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Atlantic Recording Corporation, Appellant/Cross-Appellee Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Appellant/Cross-Appellee UMG Recordings Inc., Appellant/Cross-Appellee Warner Bros Records Inc and Appellant/Cross-Appellee United States. [10-1883, 10-1947] (AS)
August 31, 2010 NOTICE of filing the following transcript(s) in district court by Court Reporter Valerie A. O'Hara: 02/08/2006, motion hearing; 07/28/2009, trial; 07/30/2009, trial; 07/27/2009, voir dire. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [10-1883] (AS)
August 27, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee/Cross-Appellant Joel Tenenbaum in 10-1883 filed by Attorney Charles Nesson. Certificate of service dated 08/27/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947] (CRN)
August 24, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant/Cross-Appellee US in 10-1947 filed by Attorney Jeffrey Clair. Certificate of service dated 08/24/2010. [10-1883, 10-1947] (JAC)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the parties to proceed under F.R.A.P 28.1. [10-1883, 10-1947] (AS)
August 11, 2010 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT ordered: 07/27/2009, voir dire; 07/28/2009, trial; 07/30/2009, trial; 02/08/2006, motion hearing. Transcript(s) due 10/12/2010 from Court Reporter Valerie A. O'Hara. [10-1883] (AS)
August 10, 2010 Filing 4 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 08/10/2010. [10-1883] (DJC)
August 10, 2010 Filing 3 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc. Certificate of service dated 08/10/2010. [10-1883] (DJC)
August 10, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc filed by Attorney Daniel J. Cloherty. Certificate of service dated 08/10/2010. [10-1883] (DJC)
July 27, 2010 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #49) filed by Appellants Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings Inc. and Warner Bros Records Inc. Docketing Statement due 08/10/2010. Transcript Report/Order form due 08/10/2010. Appearance form due 08/10/2010. [10-1883] (AS)

Search for this case: Sony BMG Music Entertainment, et al v. Tenenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: SONY BMG MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, a Delaware general partnership
Represented By: John Robert Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: WARNER BROS RECORDS INC, a Deleware Corporation
Represented By: John Robert Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: John Robert Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: ARISTA RECORDS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
Represented By: John Robert Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: UMG RECORDINGS INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: John Robert Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: JOEL TENENBAUM
Represented By: Matthew H. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE NASHVILLE SONGWRITERS ASSOCIATION INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Mary Thomas Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SONGWRITERS GUILD OF AMERICA
Represented By: Mary Thomas Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TELEVISION AND RADIO ARTISTS
Represented By: Mary Thomas Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA
Represented By: Mary Thomas Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Mark A. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BERKMAN CENTER FOR INTERNET & SOCIETY AT HARVARD LAW SCHOOL
Represented By: Diane Cabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FREE SOFTWARE FOUNDATION
Represented By: Theodore Griswold Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Michelle Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?