Hoff, et al v. Del Carmen Garriga, et al
Plaintiff: RICARDO HEREDIA, RAFAEL DIAZ-LEBRON, MARIA GARRIGA, ENRIQUE MARTINEZ-ABREU, JUAN CANCIO-RODRIGUEZ, ENRIQUE FIERRES-GONZALEZ, CARMEN MARANTE-RODRIGUEZ, YASMIN STELLA LEDEE-MONGE, JUAN SANCHEZ, ENRIQUE CARRILLO, IRIS QUINONES-RAMIREZ, SYLVIA CANCIO, FERNANDO CASO, ZRM GROUP, MAGDA CANCIO, JOSE LOPEZ-RIVERA, LYDIA LOPEZ-RODRIGUEZ, ADA CAPO, YOLANDA SNEED, ALICIA RAFFUCCI, MARIA ALMENA, ELIUD PADILLA-ROSA, SEBASTIAN ESTARELLAS, ALBERTO FERNANDEZ-CARBIA, RAFAEL JIMENEZ-BARRERAS, SONIA LATIMER, FERNANDO LOPEZ-DIRUBE, CESAR CALDERON, NEWLYN DEVELOPERS, CECI MONTILLA-ROJO, ANGEL G. RIVERA, NEXUS DEVELOPMENT GROUP, DOLORES GORROCHATEGUI, IVAN LIZARDI-ESTRADA, LUCY GONZALEZ, RENEIDA VARGAS-OCASIO, ANGEL LOPEZ, IRIS RAMIREZ-OQUENDO, VICTOR GINORIO, LUZ ARROYO, CONSUELO SANABRIA, WILLIAM CARRASQUILLO, JOAQUIN CRESPO-MOYET, MARIA LUQUE, ALFRED TOLEDO, JORGE LEISECA-GARMENDIA, NAILA FIGUEROA-ARCE, MAGDALENA DIAZ-PIZA, MANUEL MIRANDA, ANDREW HALKO, VICTOR RODRIGUEZ, MYRNA LUGO, JENNIFER BIAGGI, CARLOS LUGO, HARRY OJEAS-PABEY, JORGE NIEVES-VELAZQUEZ, ANGELA RIVERA, ALBERTO RODRIGUEZ, JULIA CAMARENO, ANA BEIRUT, EDRICK TORRES-ROCHE, JAIME COLLEY-SANCHEZ, BRUNILDA GARCIA, ROSE CASANOVA, MARIA FEBLES, MARIA BERLINGERI, FRANCISCO ESTEVES-VERGNES, JOSE RAMIREZ-TORRES, EMILIA VAZQUEZ-STEFANI, SANDRA CRUZ, MAGDA HAIDAR-GRAU, CARMEN OLIVENCIA, CARLOS CAMINO-RIOS, IRMA SANTIAGO-MARTINEZ, NEREIDA RESTO, OCTAVIO RAMOS-PUMAREJO, MARIA SABATER, PEDRO ROSELL-BORGES, SONIA SANTIAGO-MARTINEZ, EDWIN FIGUEROA-BRANUELAS, SANDRA GONZALEZ, JOSE TORRES, FIERRES, INC., JORGE RAMIREZ-NIEVES, LUIS PRATTS, HECTOR RODRIGUEZ, JOSE JANER-VELAZQUEZ, JUAN DAZ-MORALES, SARAI TORRES, MIRTA ESPINOSA, JORGE JULIA-RODRIGUEZ, WILMA ORTEGA, JERRY RIVERA, NILMARIE JIMENEZ-PICO, DIANA SILVESTRY, ANGELES PILLICH-LOPEZ, IRENE RAMIREZ-SEPULVEDA, CARLOS RIOS, RAFAEL GARCIA, ISMAEL LA TORRE, JOSE CASO, JESUS RAYMOND, MIGUEL CANCIO, MARCELINO VARELA, RAFAEL IRIZARRY, LUIS IRIZARRY-CUEBAS, MARIA JIMENEZ-PICO, HECTOR HERRERA, NESTOR CARDONA-AVILES, MARTA HARRISON, JORGE ESTARELLAS, MANUEL A. COLON-CABRERA and ISEL PEDROSA
Defendant: CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC., UBS FINANCIAL SERVICES INCORPORATED OF PUERTO RICO, FREDERIC V. SALERNO, RICHARD L. CARRION, MARIA L. FERRE, PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS, LLP, MANUEL MORALES, FRANCISCO M. REXACH, ALL DEFENDANTS, POPULAR SECURITES, INC., MICHAEL J. MASIN, WILLIAM J. TEUBER, JORGE A. JUNQUERA, JUAN J. BERMUDEZ, POPULAR, INC. and JOSE R. VIZCARRONDO
Interested Party: MIGUEL CANIO, FRANCISCO LOPEZ-DOSAL, CARMEN MUNOZ-BERRERO, M. ROMERO-SANCHEZ, HAYDEE LOPEZ-DUPRY, JUAN JOSE GARCIA-RODRIGUEZ, BENINGNO GONZALEZ, MARIA D. LUQUE-VILLAFANE, JUAN CANCIO, JOSE ALONSO, ALFREDO CARL MELTZ-NARVAEZ, JESUS M. ZAYAS, EDWIN FIGUEROA-BRAUNE, LOMBARDO PEREZ, MARIA DEL CARMEN GARRIGA and ANGEL LOPEZ-SANCHEZ
Not Classified By Court: LUISA VIRGINIA FUSTER BERLINGERI
Intervenor: DALMIS PEREZ
Plaintiff / Appellee: RUSELL HOFF, ESTATE OF MANUEL ROMERO-SANCHEZ, Represented by its Administrator Fernando Otero, Consolidated from Civil 09-1582, JMV INVESTMENT GROUP INC., Represented by its Administrator Fernando Otero, Consolidated from Civil 09-1582, ALL PLAINTIFFS, GENERAL RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF DETROIT, FERNANDO OTERO, as Administrator of the Estate of Manuel Romero-Sanchez and JMV Investment Group, Inc., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. Consolidated from Civil 09-1582, JOSE L. PUIG-RIVERA, NILDA PICO and RUBEN GARCIA
Case Number: 12-1008
Filed: January 23, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2012 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Andres W. Lopez for Appellees All Plaintiffs, Rusell Hoff, General Retirement System of the City of Detroit, Nilda Pico, Jose L. Puig-Rivera and Not Parties All Defendants, Popular, Inc., Richard L. Carrion and Jorge A. Junquera. Copy of 2/15/2012 Judgment & Mandate. Forwarding address unknown. [12-1008] (MA) [Entered: 02/28/2012 09:11 AM]
February 15, 2012 MANDATE issued. [12-1008] (MA) [Entered: 02/15/2012 10:15 AM]
February 15, 2012 JUDGMENT dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). 12-1008 42b [12-1008] (MA) [Entered: 02/15/2012 10:13 AM]
February 6, 2012 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellants Jose Alonso, Juan Cancio, Miguel Canio, Maria Del Carmen Garriga, Edwin Figueroa-Braune, Juan Jose Garcia-Rodriguez, Beningno Gonzalez, Francisco Lopez-Dosal, Haydee Lopez-Dupry, Angel Lopez-Sanchez, Maria D. Luque-Villafane, Alfredo Carl Meltz-Narvaez, Carmen Munoz-Berrero, Lombardo Perez, M. Romero-Sanchez, Emilia Vazquez-Stefani and Jesus M. Zayas. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2012. (***Pleading Originally Filed on 1/30/2012****) [12-1008] (MA) [Entered: 02/06/2012 10:25 AM]
February 6, 2012 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #226) filed by Appellants Jose Alonso, Juan Cancio, Miguel Canio, Maria Del Carmen Garriga, Edwin Figueroa-Braune, Juan Jose Garcia-Rodriguez, Beningno Gonzalez, Francisco Lopez-Dosal, Haydee Lopez-Dupry, Angel Lopez-Sanchez, Maria D. Luque-Villafane, Alfredo Carl Meltz-Narvaez, Carmen Munoz-Berrero, Lombardo Perez, M. Romero-Sanchez, Emilia Vazquez-Stefani and Jesus M. Zayas. Docketing Statement due 02/21/2012. Transcript Report/Order form due 02/21/2012. Appearance form due 02/21/2012. [12-1008] (MA) [Entered: 02/06/2012 10:00 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Hoff, et al v. Del Carmen Garriga, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICARDO HEREDIA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAFAEL DIAZ-LEBRON
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA GARRIGA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENRIQUE MARTINEZ-ABREU
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN CANCIO-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENRIQUE FIERRES-GONZALEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMEN MARANTE-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YASMIN STELLA LEDEE-MONGE
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN SANCHEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENRIQUE CARRILLO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRIS QUINONES-RAMIREZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVIA CANCIO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERNANDO CASO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZRM GROUP
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAGDA CANCIO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE LOPEZ-RIVERA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYDIA LOPEZ-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADA CAPO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOLANDA SNEED
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICIA RAFFUCCI
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA ALMENA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIUD PADILLA-ROSA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEBASTIAN ESTARELLAS
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERTO FERNANDEZ-CARBIA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAFAEL JIMENEZ-BARRERAS
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONIA LATIMER
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERNANDO LOPEZ-DIRUBE
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CESAR CALDERON
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEWLYN DEVELOPERS
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECI MONTILLA-ROJO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGEL G. RIVERA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEXUS DEVELOPMENT GROUP
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOLORES GORROCHATEGUI
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IVAN LIZARDI-ESTRADA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCY GONZALEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENEIDA VARGAS-OCASIO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGEL LOPEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRIS RAMIREZ-OQUENDO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR GINORIO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUZ ARROYO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONSUELO SANABRIA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM CARRASQUILLO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAQUIN CRESPO-MOYET
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA LUQUE
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFRED TOLEDO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE LEISECA-GARMENDIA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAILA FIGUEROA-ARCE
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAGDALENA DIAZ-PIZA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL MIRANDA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW HALKO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYRNA LUGO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER BIAGGI
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS LUGO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRY OJEAS-PABEY
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE NIEVES-VELAZQUEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA RIVERA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERTO RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA CAMARENO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANA BEIRUT
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDRICK TORRES-ROCHE
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAIME COLLEY-SANCHEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUNILDA GARCIA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE CASANOVA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA FEBLES
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA BERLINGERI
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO ESTEVES-VERGNES
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE RAMIREZ-TORRES
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMILIA VAZQUEZ-STEFANI
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA CRUZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAGDA HAIDAR-GRAU
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMEN OLIVENCIA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS CAMINO-RIOS
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRMA SANTIAGO-MARTINEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEREIDA RESTO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCTAVIO RAMOS-PUMAREJO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA SABATER
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEDRO ROSELL-BORGES
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONIA SANTIAGO-MARTINEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWIN FIGUEROA-BRANUELAS
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA GONZALEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE TORRES
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIERRES, INC.
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE RAMIREZ-NIEVES
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS PRATTS
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HECTOR RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE JANER-VELAZQUEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN DAZ-MORALES
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAI TORRES
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRTA ESPINOSA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE JULIA-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMA ORTEGA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY RIVERA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NILMARIE JIMENEZ-PICO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA SILVESTRY
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELES PILLICH-LOPEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRENE RAMIREZ-SEPULVEDA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS RIOS
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAFAEL GARCIA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISMAEL LA TORRE
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE CASO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESUS RAYMOND
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIGUEL CANCIO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCELINO VARELA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAFAEL IRIZARRY
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS IRIZARRY-CUEBAS
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA JIMENEZ-PICO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HECTOR HERRERA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NESTOR CARDONA-AVILES
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTA HARRISON
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE ESTARELLAS
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL A. COLON-CABRERA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISEL PEDROSA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC.
Represented By: Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Daniel Lewis
Represented By: Herbert Washer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS FINANCIAL SERVICES INCORPORATED OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Daniel Lewis
Represented By: Herbert Washer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREDERIC V. SALERNO
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Represented By: Sara Lydia Velez-Santiago
Represented By: Maria Dolores Bertolez-Elvira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD L. CARRION
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Scott
Represented By: Sara Lydia Velez-Santiago
Represented By: Darrell S. Cafasso
Represented By: Andres W. Lopez
Represented By: Joseph E. Neuhaus
Represented By: David H. Braff
Represented By: Maria Dolores Bertolez-Elvira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA L. FERRE
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Represented By: Sara Lydia Velez-Santiago
Represented By: Maria Dolores Bertolez-Elvira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS, LLP
Represented By: John P. Brumbaugh
Represented By: Elizabeth V. Tanis
Represented By: Roberto Santana-Aparicio
Represented By: Russell Del Toro-Sosa Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANUEL MORALES
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Represented By: Sara Lydia Velez-Santiago
Represented By: Maria Dolores Bertolez-Elvira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCISCO M. REXACH
Represented By: Ana Matilde Nin-Torregrosa
Represented By: Lilia R. Rodriguez-Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL DEFENDANTS
Represented By: Andres W. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POPULAR SECURITES, INC.
Represented By: Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Daniel Lewis
Represented By: Herbert Washer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J. MASIN
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Represented By: Sara Lydia Velez-Santiago
Represented By: Maria Dolores Bertolez-Elvira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM J. TEUBER
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Represented By: Sara Lydia Velez-Santiago
Represented By: Maria Dolores Bertolez-Elvira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE A. JUNQUERA
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Scott
Represented By: Sara Lydia Velez-Santiago
Represented By: Darrell S. Cafasso
Represented By: Andres W. Lopez
Represented By: Joseph E. Neuhaus
Represented By: David H. Braff
Represented By: Maria Dolores Bertolez-Elvira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUAN J. BERMUDEZ
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Represented By: Sara Lydia Velez-Santiago
Represented By: Maria Dolores Bertolez-Elvira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POPULAR, INC.
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Scott
Represented By: Sara Lydia Velez-Santiago
Represented By: Darrell S. Cafasso
Represented By: Andres W. Lopez
Represented By: Joseph E. Neuhaus
Represented By: David H. Braff
Represented By: Maria Dolores Bertolez-Elvira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE R. VIZCARRONDO
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Represented By: Sara Lydia Velez-Santiago
Represented By: Maria Dolores Bertolez-Elvira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MIGUEL CANIO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FRANCISCO LOPEZ-DOSAL
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CARMEN MUNOZ-BERRERO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: M. ROMERO-SANCHEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HAYDEE LOPEZ-DUPRY
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JUAN JOSE GARCIA-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BENINGNO GONZALEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MARIA D. LUQUE-VILLAFANE
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JUAN CANCIO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOSE ALONSO
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ALFREDO CARL MELTZ-NARVAEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JESUS M. ZAYAS
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: EDWIN FIGUEROA-BRAUNE
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LOMBARDO PEREZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MARIA DEL CARMEN GARRIGA
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ANGEL LOPEZ-SANCHEZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Kirk Wood
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: LUISA VIRGINIA FUSTER BERLINGERI
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: DALMIS PEREZ
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RUSELL HOFF
Represented By: David Avi Rosenfeld
Represented By: Jeremy P. Robinson
Represented By: Andres W. Lopez
Represented By: Robert Michael Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ESTATE OF MANUEL ROMERO-SANCHEZ, Represented by its Administrator Fernando Otero, Consolidated from Civil 09-1582
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JMV INVESTMENT GROUP INC., Represented by its Administrator Fernando Otero, Consolidated from Civil 09-1582
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Represented By: Andres W. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GENERAL RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF DETROIT
Represented By: Roberto O. Maldonado-Nieves
Represented By: Jeremy P. Robinson
Represented By: Salvatore J. Graziano
Represented By: Gerald H. Silk
Represented By: Andres W. Lopez
Represented By: Laura H. Gundersheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FERNANDO OTERO, as Administrator of the Estate of Manuel Romero-Sanchez and JMV Investment Group, Inc., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. Consolidated from Civil 09-1582
Represented By: Eric Quetglas-Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSE L. PUIG-RIVERA
Represented By: David Avi Rosenfeld
Represented By: Jeremy P. Robinson
Represented By: Ellen Gusikoff-Stewart
Represented By: Andres W. Lopez
Represented By: Robert Michael Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NILDA PICO
Represented By: David Avi Rosenfeld
Represented By: Jeremy P. Robinson
Represented By: Ellen Gusikoff-Stewart
Represented By: Andres W. Lopez
Represented By: Robert Michael Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RUBEN GARCIA
Represented By: Luis E. Minana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?