Carrasquillo, et al v. American Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff - Appellant: ELIZABETH CARRASQUILLO, CARMEN GUZMAN-VAZQUEZ, DANIEL OUVINA, VICTOR RIVERA, MATILDE RODRIGUEZ-NOA, BRENDA ENID VAZQUEZ-DIAZ and FRED VOLTAGGIO-DE JESUS
Defendant - Appellee: AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.
Case Number: 15-1424
Filed: April 14, 2015
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Employment

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 22, 2016 Summary Carrasquillo-Ortiz v. American Airlines, Inc.
January 27, 2016 Summary Carrasquillo-Ortiz v. American Airlines, Inc.
June 9, 2016 Summary Carrasquillo-Ortiz v. American Airlines, Inc.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107012117 OPINION issued by Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge; Michael Daly Hawkins,* Senior Appellate Judge and David J. Barron, Appellate Judge. Published. * Of the Ninth Circuit, sitting by designation. [15-1424]
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106950044 ERRATA issued by court to opinion (published) [5971612-2]. [15-1424]
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106948926 OPINION issued by Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge; Michael Daly Hawkins,* Senior Appellate Judge and David J. Barron, Appellate Judge. Published. *Of the Ninth Circuit, sitting by designation. [15-1424]
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Carrasquillo, et al v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: ELIZABETH CARRASQUILLO
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: CARMEN GUZMAN-VAZQUEZ
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: DANIEL OUVINA
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: VICTOR RIVERA
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: MATILDE RODRIGUEZ-NOA
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: BRENDA ENID VAZQUEZ-DIAZ
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: FRED VOLTAGGIO-DE JESUS
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.
Represented By: Patricia Acosta
Represented By: Luis Roberto Amadeo Carron
Represented By: Juan C. Enjamio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?