Garcia-Garcia v. Lynch
Petitioner: VICTOR GARCIA-GARCIA
Respondent: LORETTA E. LYNCH
Case Number: 15-2571
Filed: December 31, 2015
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 3, 2017 Summary Garcia-Garcia v. Sessions
June 5, 2017 Summary Garcia-Garcia v. Sessions
July 18, 2017 Summary Garcia-Garcia v. Sessions

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107178115 ERRATA issued by court to opinion (published) [6088773-2]. [15-2571, 16-1964]
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107162891 ERRATA issued by court to opinion (published) [6088773-2]. [15-2571, 16-1964]
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Garcia-Garcia v. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VICTOR GARCIA-GARCIA
Represented By: Nancy Jean Kelly
Represented By: John Edward Willshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LORETTA E. LYNCH
Represented By: LaTia N. Bing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?