Hussein v. Lyons
Respondent: CHRISTOPHER BRACKETT, Superintendent of Strafford County Department of Corrections
Undetermined: ABDIGANI FAISAL HUSSEIN, TODD LYONS, Boston Field Office Director of US Immigration and Customs Enforcement and TODD M. LYONS, Boston Field Office Director of US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 19-1012
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Construing Attorney Terry Lynn Ollila's notice of attorney withdrawal as a motion to withdraw as counsel for respondent-appellant Todd Lyons, the motion is allowed. See 1st Cir. R. 12.0(b). Attorney Terry Lynn Ollila is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record in this appeal. Respondent-appellant Todd Lyons will continue to be represented by his remaining counsel of record. [19-1012] (GB) [Entered: 02/25/2019 01:17 PM]
February 22, 2019 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal filed by Appellant Todd Lyons. Certificate of service dated 02/22/2019. [19-1012] (TLO) [Entered: 02/22/2019 03:15 PM]
February 20, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Todd Lyons filed by Attorney Sarah Stevens Wilson. Certificate of service dated 02/20/2019. [19-1012] (SSW) [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:43 PM]
February 19, 2019 ASSENTED TO MOTION to stay Briefing Pending the Supreme Court's Decision in Nielson v. Preap filed by Appellant Todd Lyons. Certificate of service dated 02/19/2019. [19-1012] (TLO) [Entered: 02/19/2019 03:58 PM]
February 13, 2019 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Thomas P. Velardi for Christopher Brackett. [19-1012] (GB) [Entered: 02/13/2019 10:52 AM]
February 13, 2019 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Thomas P. Velardi for Not Party Christopher Brackett. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1012] (GB) [Entered: 02/13/2019 10:51 AM]
February 12, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Abdigani Faisal Hussein filed by Attorney Benjamin J. Wahrer. Certificate of service dated 02/12/2019. [19-1012] (BJW) [Entered: 02/12/2019 10:48 AM]
February 12, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 03/25/2019 for appellant Todd Lyons. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1012] (GB) [Entered: 02/12/2019 10:04 AM]
February 12, 2019 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Thomas P. Velardi for Christopher Brackett. [19-1012] (GB) [Entered: 02/12/2019 09:57 AM]
February 7, 2019 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Mark J. Devine for Abdigani Hussein. [19-1012] (GB) [Entered: 02/07/2019 08:33 AM]
February 6, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Todd Lyons indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 02/06/2019. [19-1012] (TLO) [Entered: 02/06/2019 04:01 PM]
February 6, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Todd Lyons. Certificate of service dated 02/06/2019. [19-1012] (TLO) [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:58 PM]
February 6, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Todd Lyons filed by Attorney Terry L. Ollila, AUSA. Certificate of service dated 02/06/2019. [19-1012] (TLO) [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:55 PM]
January 24, 2019 CORRECTED NOTICE* of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript report/order form due 02/06/2019 . *Corrected order issued to amend text of the order. [19-1012] (GB) [Entered: 01/24/2019 12:08 PM]
January 23, 2019 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript report/order form due 02/06/2019 . [19-1012] (GB) [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:15 AM]
January 23, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 02/06/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Mark J. Devine for Abdigani Hussein and Thomas P. Velardi for Christopher Brackett. [19-1012] (GB) [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:04 AM]
January 16, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Abdigani Hussein filed by Attorney Gilles Bissonnette. Certificate of service dated 01/16/2019. [19-1012] (GRB) [Entered: 01/16/2019 12:10 PM]
January 14, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Abdigani Hussein filed by Attorney Judy Rabinovitz. Certificate of service dated 01/14/2019. [19-1012] (JR) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:19 PM]
January 14, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Abdigani Hussein filed by Attorney Michael King Thomas Tan. Certificate of service dated 01/14/2019. [19-1012] (MKT) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:15 PM]
January 10, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Abdigani Hussein filed by Attorney Twain Braden. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2019. [19-1012] (TB) [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:44 PM]
January 10, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Abdigani Hussein filed by Attorney Henry Klementowicz. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2019. [19-1012] (HRK) [Entered: 01/10/2019 10:04 AM]
January 10, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Abdigani Hussein filed by Attorney SangYeob Kim. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2019. [19-1012] (SK) [Entered: 01/10/2019 09:50 AM]
January 8, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #22) filed by Appellant Todd Lyons. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 01/22/2019 . [19-1012] (GB) [Entered: 01/08/2019 02:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussein v. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHRISTOPHER BRACKETT, Superintendent of Strafford County Department of Corrections
Represented By: Thomas P. Velardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ABDIGANI FAISAL HUSSEIN
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wahrer
Represented By: Twain Braden
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Henry R. Klementowicz
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: SangYeob Kim
Represented By: Mark J. Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: TODD LYONS, Boston Field Office Director of US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Terry Lynn Ollila
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: Sarah S. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: TODD M. LYONS, Boston Field Office Director of US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: Sarah S. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?