Locascio v. Spaulding

Respondent / Appellee: WARDEN S. SPAULDING, Federal Medical Center, Devens
Petitioner / Appellant: FRANK LOCASCIO
Case Number: 19-1033
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Warden S. Spaulding filed by Attorney Mackenzie A. Queenin. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2019. [19-1033] (MQ) [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:09 AM]
March 7, 2019 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Frank Locascio. Certificate of service dated 03/04/2019. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 03/14/2019 . Brief due 04/03/2019 for APPELLEE Warden S. Spaulding. [19-1033] (LIM) [Entered: 03/07/2019 08:54 AM]
March 4, 2019 BRIEF tendered by Appellant Frank Locascio. [19-1033] (RCC) [Entered: 03/04/2019 11:20 AM]
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER directing Appellant Frank Locascio to file a conforming brief. Brief due 03/05/2019. [19-1033] (CP) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:56 AM]
February 21, 2019 BRIEF tendered by Appellant Frank Locascio. [19-1033] (RCC) [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:54 PM]
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER directing Appellant Frank Locascio to file a conforming brief. Brief due 02/27/2019. Appendix due 02/27/2019. [19-1033] (CP) [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:04 PM]
February 18, 2019 BRIEF tendered by Appellant Frank Locascio. [19-1033] (RCC) [Entered: 02/18/2019 02:04 PM]
January 31, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 03/12/2019 for appellant Frank Locascio. Appendix due 03/12/2019 for appellant Frank Locascio. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1033] (CP) [Entered: 01/31/2019 12:52 PM]
January 25, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Frank Locascio. Certificate of service dated 01/25/2019. [19-1033] (RCC) [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:45 PM]
January 22, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Frank Locascio filed by Attorney Richard C. Chambers, Jr., Esq.. Certificate of service dated 01/22/2019. [19-1033] (RCC) [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:00 PM]
January 10, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #12) filed by Appellant Frank Locascio. Docketing Statement due 01/24/2019. Appearance form due 01/24/2019. [19-1033] (CP) [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:42 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Locascio v. Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WARDEN S. SPAULDING, Federal Medical Center, Devens
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Represented By: Mackenzie Queenin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: FRANK LOCASCIO
Represented By: Richard C. Chambers Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?