Briarwood Thirteen, LLC v. Travelers Prop. Cas. Co.

Plaintiff / Appellant: BRIARWOOD THIRTEEN, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-1055
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 MOTION for voluntary dismissal filed by Appellant Briarwood Thirteen, LLC. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2019. [19-1055]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (SRW) [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:15 PM]
February 14, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Travelers Property Casualty Company of America filed by Attorney Deborah A. Vennos. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2019. [19-1055] (DAV) [Entered: 02/14/2019 08:37 AM]
February 7, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 02/21/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless she registers for an appellate ECF account: Deborah A. Vennos for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. [19-1055] (CP) [Entered: 02/07/2019 02:46 PM]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file opening forms filed by Appellant Briarwood Thirteen, LLC. Docketing Statement due 02/26/2019. Transcript report/order form due 02/26/2019. [19-1055] (CP) [Entered: 02/06/2019 04:00 PM]
February 6, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file appearance form and docketing statement filed by Appellant Briarwood Thirteen, LLC. Certificate of service dated 02/06/2019. [19-1055] CLERK'S NOTE: Relief selection was incorrect. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (SRW) [Entered: 02/06/2019 02:09 PM]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file show cause response filed by Appellant Briarwood Thirteen, LLC. Show cause response due 02/28/2019. [19-1055]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (CP) [Entered: 02/04/2019 10:39 AM]
February 1, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file a response filed by Appellant Briarwood Thirteen, LLC. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2019. [19-1055] (SRW) [Entered: 02/01/2019 03:50 PM]
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Show cause response due 02/05/2019. [19-1055] (CP) [Entered: 01/22/2019 01:20 PM]
January 18, 2019 NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Steven R. Weiner for Appellant Briarwood Thirteen, LLC. Certificate of service was not dated. [19-1055] (CP) [Entered: 02/06/2019 10:49 AM]
January 14, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Travelers Property Casualty Company of America filed by Attorney Gregory P. Varga. Certificate of service dated 01/14/2019. [19-1055] (GPV) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:18 PM]
January 14, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #227) filed by Appellant Briarwood Thirteen, LLC. Docketing Statement due 01/28/2019. Transcript Report/Order form due 01/28/2019. Appearance form due 01/28/2019. [19-1055] (CP) [Entered: 01/14/2019 01:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briarwood Thirteen, LLC v. Travelers Prop. Cas. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRIARWOOD THIRTEEN, LLC
Represented By: Steven R. Weiner
Represented By: Carl Lindley Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Small
Represented By: Gregory P. Varga
Represented By: Deborah A. Vennos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?