Dagi v. Delta Airlines, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: DELTA AIRLINES, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: T. FORCHT DAGI, M.D.
Case Number: 19-1056
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and appendix due 04/17/2019 for appellant T. Forcht Dagi. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief, and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1056] (MH) [Entered: 03/08/2019 10:37 AM]
March 8, 2019 NOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Brenda Kay Hancock: 10/10/2018, Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [19-1056] (MH) [Entered: 03/08/2019 10:35 AM]
January 25, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant T. Forcht Dagi indicating the following transcript is being ordered: 10/10/2018, Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. Transcript due 03/26/2019 from Court Reporter Brenda Kay Hancock. [19-1056] (MH) [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:07 PM]
January 25, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant T. Forcht Dagi indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 01/25/2019. [19-1056] (HH) [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:00 PM]
January 25, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant T. Forcht Dagi. Certificate of service dated 01/25/2019. [19-1056] CLERK'S NOTE: Multiple documents cannot be included in a single filing. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS. (HH) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:52 PM]
January 18, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant T. Forcht Dagi filed by Attorney Henry Herrmann. Certificate of service dated 01/18/2019. [19-1056] (HH) [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:19 AM]
January 17, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Delta Airlines, Inc. filed by Attorney Pauline A. Jauquet. Certificate of service dated 01/17/2019. [19-1056] (PAJ) [Entered: 01/17/2019 01:39 PM]
January 16, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Delta Airlines, Inc. filed by Attorney H. Reed Witherby. Certificate of service dated 01/16/2019. [19-1056] (HRW) [Entered: 01/16/2019 05:20 PM]
January 16, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Delta Airlines, Inc. filed by Attorney Christopher A. Duggan. Certificate of service dated 01/16/2019. [19-1056] (CAD) [Entered: 01/16/2019 05:11 PM]
January 14, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #23) filed by Appellant T. Forcht Dagi. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 01/28/2019. [19-1056] (MH) [Entered: 01/14/2019 10:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dagi v. Delta Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DELTA AIRLINES, INC.
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Duggan
Represented By: H. Reed Witherby
Represented By: Pauline A. Jauquet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: T. FORCHT DAGI, M.D.
Represented By: Henry Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?