US v. Wolas
Interested Party: COMMISSIONER OF INTERNAL REVENUE, CECILY STURGE, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION and INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Defendant / Appellant: SCOTT J. WOLAS, a/k/a E.J.G., a/k/a D.P., a/k/a F.A., a/k/a E.A., a/k/a C.S.
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 19-1154
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Scott J. Wolas. Brief and appendix due 05/17/2019 for appellant Scott J. Wolas. [19-1154] (GRC) [Entered: 04/16/2019 12:56 PM]
April 12, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Scott J. Wolas. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2019. [19-1154] (ZBR) [Entered: 04/12/2019 05:38 PM]
March 18, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Scott J. Wolas filed by Attorney Zainabu Rumala. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1154] (ZBR) [Entered: 03/18/2019 06:15 PM]
March 5, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 04/15/2019 for appellant Scott J. Wolas. Appendix due 04/15/2019 for appellant Scott J. Wolas. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1154] (GRC) [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:43 PM]
March 5, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Scott J. Wolas. Certificate of service dated 03/05/2019. [19-1154] (JFP) [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:07 PM]
March 5, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Scott J. Wolas filed by Attorney Jane F. Peachy. Certificate of service dated 03/05/2019. [19-1154] (JFP) [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:04 PM]
March 5, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Scott J. Wolas indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 03/05/2019. [19-1154] (JFP) [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:05 PM]
February 20, 2019 CRIMINAL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #97) filed by Appellant Scott J. Wolas. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 03/06/2019. [19-1154] (GRC) [Entered: 02/20/2019 01:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: US v. Wolas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COMMISSIONER OF INTERNAL REVENUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CECILY STURGE
Represented By: William W. Fick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SCOTT J. WOLAS, a/k/a E.J.G., a/k/a D.P., a/k/a F.A., a/k/a E.A., a/k/a C.S.
Represented By: Jane F. Peachy
Represented By: Zainabu Brittany-Rachel Rumala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Sandra S. Bower
Represented By: Carol Elisabeth Head
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?