US v. Nieves-Melendez
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Defendant / Appellant: IESUS JUAN NIEVES-MELENDEZ and IESUS JUAN NIEVES-MELENDEZ, a/k/a Gordo Metro, a/k/a Gordo Metra
Case Number: 19-1331
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file opening forms filed by Appellant Iesus Juan Nieves-Melendez. Appearance Form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript report/order form due 05/28/2019. [19-1331] (GRC) [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:11 PM]
May 3, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form filed by Appellant Iesus Juan Nieves-Melendez. Certificate of service dated 05/03/2019. [19-1331] (ELS) [Entered: 05/03/2019 05:31 PM]
May 1, 2019 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript report/order form due 05/15/2019. [19-1331] (GRC) [Entered: 05/01/2019 01:34 PM]
April 12, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Mariana E. Bauza. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2019. [19-1331] (MEB) [Entered: 04/12/2019 10:31 AM]
April 11, 2019 CRIMINAL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #169) filed by Appellant Iesus Juan Nieves-Melendez. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 04/25/2019. [19-1331] (GRC) [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US v. Nieves-Melendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Maria L. Montanez-Concepcion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: IESUS JUAN NIEVES-MELENDEZ
Represented By: Edgar L. Sanchez-Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: IESUS JUAN NIEVES-MELENDEZ, a/k/a Gordo Metro, a/k/a Gordo Metra
Represented By: Edgar L. Sanchez-Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?