Migrant Health Center, Inc., et al v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Plaintiff: TOA ALTA COMPREHENSIVE URBAN/RURAL ADVANCED HEALTH SERVICES, INC., MUNICIPALITY OF SAN JUAN, HEALTHPROMED FOUNDATION, INC., f/k/a Dr. Jose S. Belaval, Inc. and RIO GRANDE COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTER, INC.
Defendant: MICHAEL O. LEAVITT, as Secretary of US Department of Health, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO and JOHNNY RULLAN
Petitioner: TRIPLE-S SALUD, INC. and TRIPLE C, INC.
Intervenor: INSTITUTO DE OJOS Y PIEL INC.
Plaintiff / Appellee: CIALES PRIMARY HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., COSTA SALUD, INC., f/k/a Rincon Health Center, Inc., NEOMED CENTER, INC., f/k/a Gurabo Community Health Center, Inc., MOROVIS COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTER, INC., CORPORACION DE SERVICIOS DE SALUD Y MEDICINA AVANZADA, INC., (COSSMA), CORPORACION DE SERV. MEDICOS PRIMARIOS Y PREVENCION DE HATILLO, INC., CORP. DE SERVICIOS INTEGRALES DE SALUD INTEGRAL DE LA MONTANA, INC., CENTRO DE SALUD DE LARES, INC., HOSPITAL GENERAL CASTANAR, INC., CENTRO DE SERVICIOS PRIMARIOS DE SALUD DE PATILLAS, INC., CENTRO DE SALUD FAMILIAR DR. JULIO PALMIERI FERRI, INC., ATLANTIC MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MIGRANT HEALTH CENTER, INC., CONCILIO DE SALUD INTEGRAL DE LOIZA, INC. (CSILO) and CAMUY HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
Interested Party: GREGORIO IGARTUA-DE LA ROSA, MEDICAL CARD SYSTEMS, INC. and GERARDO A. RODRIGUEZ NEGRON, Special Master
Defendant / Appellant: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Case Number: 19-1336
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 4, 2020 Summary Migrant Health Center, Inc. v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing fee was paid in the district court by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico on 05/16/2019. [19-1336] (GK) [Entered: 05/20/2019 10:10 AM]
May 9, 2019 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss for failure to pay the filing fee. Fee due 05/23/2019. [19-1336] (GK) [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:33 PM]
May 2, 2019 CERTIFICATE of service for transcript report/order form [ # 6251279-2 ], docketing statement [ # 6251278-2 ] filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2019. [19-1336] (CL) [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:47 AM]
May 2, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2019. [19-1336] (CL) [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:40 AM]
May 2, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2019. [19-1336] (CL) [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:39 AM]
May 1, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Carlos Lugo-Fiol. Certificate of service dated 05/01/2019. [19-1336] (CL) [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:06 PM]
April 18, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #1199) filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Fee due 05/02/2019. [19-1336] (GRC) [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Migrant Health Center, Inc., et al v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: INSTITUTO DE OJOS Y PIEL INC.
Represented By: Jose Enrique Colon Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL O. LEAVITT, as Secretary of US Department of Health
Represented By: Jose M. Pizarro-Zayas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Luke M. Jones
Represented By: Stephen J. Buckingham
Represented By: Jose M. Pizarro-Zayas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNNY RULLAN
Represented By: Jaime J. Zampierollo-Vila
Represented By: Eileen Landron-Guardiola
Represented By: Marcia I. Perez-Llavona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CIALES PRIMARY HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COSTA SALUD, INC., f/k/a Rincon Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NEOMED CENTER, INC., f/k/a Gurabo Community Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Maria Celeste Rodriguez Miranda
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Iyen Acosta
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MOROVIS COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Maria Celeste Rodriguez Miranda
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Iyen Acosta
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CORPORACION DE SERVICIOS DE SALUD Y MEDICINA AVANZADA, INC., (COSSMA)
Represented By: Maria Celeste Rodriguez Miranda
Represented By: Iyen Acosta
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CORPORACION DE SERV. MEDICOS PRIMARIOS Y PREVENCION DE HATILLO, INC.
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CORP. DE SERVICIOS INTEGRALES DE SALUD INTEGRAL DE LA MONTANA, INC.
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Iyen Acosta
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CENTRO DE SALUD DE LARES, INC.
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HOSPITAL GENERAL CASTANAR, INC.
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CENTRO DE SERVICIOS PRIMARIOS DE SALUD DE PATILLAS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CENTRO DE SALUD FAMILIAR DR. JULIO PALMIERI FERRI, INC.
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ATLANTIC MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MIGRANT HEALTH CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Maria Celeste Rodriguez Miranda
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Iyen Acosta
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CONCILIO DE SALUD INTEGRAL DE LOIZA, INC. (CSILO)
Represented By: Maria Celeste Rodriguez Miranda
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Iyen Acosta
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAMUY HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GREGORIO IGARTUA-DE LA ROSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MEDICAL CARD SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Laura Yazmin Femenias-Jove
Represented By: Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GERARDO A. RODRIGUEZ NEGRON, Special Master
Represented By: Gerardo A. Rodriguez Negron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TRIPLE-S SALUD, INC.
Represented By: Osvaldo Feliu-Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TRIPLE C, INC.
Represented By: Manuel A. Pietrantoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOA ALTA COMPREHENSIVE URBAN/RURAL ADVANCED HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUNICIPALITY OF SAN JUAN
Represented By: Francisco J. Amundaray-Rodriguez
Represented By: Simone Cataldi-Malpica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTHPROMED FOUNDATION, INC., f/k/a Dr. Jose S. Belaval, Inc.
Represented By: Maria Celeste Rodriguez Miranda
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Iyen Acosta
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIO GRANDE COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Luis Alberto Alvarez-Vazquez
Represented By: Robert Arthur Graham
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Lourdes Martinez-Jimenez
Represented By: Nicole Marie Bacon
Represented By: James Leo Feldesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Jaime J. Zampierollo-Vila
Represented By: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Marcia I. Perez-Llavona
Represented By: Luis Jeronimo Lopez-Valdes
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?