James v. Berryhill
Plaintiff / Appellant: DEBRA ANN JAMES
Defendant / Appellee: NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Social Security Administration
Case Number: 19-1345
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 DOCKET sheet sent to appellant. [19-1345] (KC) [Entered: 05/23/2019 12:47 PM]
May 21, 2019 LETTER sent to Appellant Debra Ann James in response to her correspondence docketed May 20, 2019 and enclosing a copy of the docket and rulebook. [19-1345]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (KC) [Entered: 05/21/2019 01:19 PM]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Construing the letter filed by plaintiff-appellant Debra Ann James as a motion for an extension of time to file appellant's brief, the motion is allowed. It is ordered that the time for appellant to file a brief be enlarged to and including June 20, 2019 . [19-1345] (KC) [Entered: 05/21/2019 01:11 PM]
May 20, 2019 LETTER filed by Appellant Debra Ann James requesting an extension of time to file the brief. [19-1345] (KC) [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:26 PM]
April 10, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 05/20/2019 for appellant Debra Ann James. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1345] (KC) [Entered: 04/10/2019 01:34 PM]
April 10, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Nancy A. Berryhill filed by Attorney Michael L. Henry. Certificate of service dated 04/10/2019. [19-1345] (MLH) [Entered: 04/10/2019 10:17 AM]
April 9, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #13) filed by Appellant Debra Ann James. Fee due 04/23/2019. [19-1345] (KC) [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEBRA ANN JAMES
Represented By: Debra Ann James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Social Security Administration
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?