58 Swansea Mall Drive LLC v. Gator Swansea Property LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant: 58 SWANSEA MALL DRIVE LLC
Defendant / Appellee: GATOR SWANSEA PROPERTY LLC
Case Number: 19-1347
Filed: April 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Gator Swansea Property LLC. Brief and Appendix due 07/10/2019 for appellant Gator Swansea Property LLC. [19-1306, 19-1347] (GB) [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:01 PM]
May 24, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Gator Swansea Property LLC in 19-1306, 19-1347. Certificate of service dated 05/24/2019. [19-1306, 19-1347] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (RJS) [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:05 AM]
April 30, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant/Cross-Appellee Gator Swansea Property LLC in 19-1306, 19-1347 filed by Attorney Sanford F. Remz. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2019. [19-1306, 19-1347] (SFR) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:01 PM]
April 30, 2019 CROSS-APPEAL briefing schedule set pursuant to F.R.A.P. 28.1. Brief and Appendix due 06/10/2019 for appellant Gator Swansea Property LLC. [19-1306, 19-1347] (GB) [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:11 AM]
April 30, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 05/14/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Adrian J. Alvarez for Gator Swansea Property LLC. [19-1347] (GB) [Entered: 04/30/2019 08:40 AM]
April 29, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee/Cross-Appellant 58 Swansea Mall Drive LLC filed by Attorney Barry S. Pollack. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2019. [19-1347] (BSP) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:32 PM]
April 29, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee/Cross-Appellant 58 Swansea Mall Drive LLC filed by Attorney Joshua L. Solomon. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2019. [19-1347] (JLS) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:31 PM]
April 29, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant 58 Swansea Mall Drive LLC indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2019. [19-1347] (JLS) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:30 PM]
April 29, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellee/Cross-Appellant 58 Swansea Mall Drive LLC. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2019. [19-1347] (JLS) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:29 PM]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER directing the parties to proceed under F.R.A.P 28.1. The parties have filed cross-appeals in No. 1:15-cv-13538-RGS (D. Mass.). Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28.1, it is hereby ordered that defendant Gator Swansea Property LLC be deemed the appellant/cross-appellee (appellant) and that plaintiff 58 Swansea Mall Drive LLC be deemed the appellee/cross-appellant (appellee). The parties are directed to use the above caption on all future filings related to these cases. A briefing schedule will be set once the record on appeal, including all necessary transcripts, is complete. The attached information sheet sets forth the filing requirements for briefs filed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28.1. [19-1306, 19-1347] (GB) [Entered: 04/26/2019 01:37 PM]
April 15, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #356) filed by Appellant 58 Swansea Mall Drive LLC. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 04/29/2019 . [19-1347] (GB) [Entered: 04/13/2019 07:50 PM]
April 15, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #356) filed by Appellant 58 Swansea Mall Drive LLC. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 04/29/2019 . [19-1347] (GB) [Entered: 04/13/2019 07:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 58 Swansea Mall Drive LLC v. Gator Swansea Property LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: 58 SWANSEA MALL DRIVE LLC
Represented By: Joshua Louis Solomon
Represented By: Karen A. Pickett
Represented By: Peter Jude Duffy
Represented By: Barry Shawn Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GATOR SWANSEA PROPERTY LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Shapiro
Represented By: Ricardo A. Reyes
Represented By: Sanford F. Remz
Represented By: Adrian J. Alvarez
Represented By: Anthony B. Fioravanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?