US v. Gonzalez

Appellee: UNITED STATES
Defendant / Appellant: EDWIN GONZALEZ, a/k/a Sangriento
Case Number: 19-1351
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 CJA FORM 24 and transcript order form filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 06/11/2019. [19-1351] (JPH) [Entered: 06/11/2019 01:09 PM]
June 11, 2019 CJA FORM 24 and transcript order form filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 06/11/2019. [19-1351] (JPH) [Entered: 06/11/2019 01:08 PM]
June 10, 2019 CJA FORM 24 and transcript order form filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 06/10/2018. [19-1351] CLERK'S NOTE: The FULL NAME of the ECF Filer must be preceded by an "s/" and FILER'S FULL NAME MUST BE typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, by 06/13/2019 . . CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JPH) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:46 PM]
May 21, 2019 CJA FORM 24 and transcript order form filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 05/21/2019. [19-1351] (JPH) [Entered: 05/21/2019 12:49 PM]
May 21, 2019 CJA FORM 24 and transcript order form filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 05/21/2019. [19-1351] (JPH) [Entered: 05/21/2019 12:44 PM]
May 20, 2019 CJA FORM 24 and transcript order form filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 05/20/2019. [19-1351] CLERK'S NOTE: The FULL NAME of the ECF Filer must be preceded by an "s/" and FILER'S FULL NAME MUST BE typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, BY 05/23/2019. (JPH) [Entered: 05/20/2019 05:03 PM]
May 20, 2019 CJA FORM 24 and transcript order form filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 05/20/2019. [19-1351] CLERK'S NOTE: The FULL NAME of the ECF Filer must be preceded by an "s/" and FILER'S FULL NAME MUST BE typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, BY 05/23/2019. (JPH) [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:35 PM]
May 20, 2019 MOTION for transcript at government expense filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 05/20/2019. [19-1351] CLERK'S NOTE: The name of the ECF Filer must be preceded by an "s/" and FILER'S FULL NAME MUST BE typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, by 05/22/2019. (JPH) [Entered: 05/20/2019 03:43 PM]
May 18, 2019 CJA FORM 24 and transcript order form filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 05/18/2019. [19-1351] CLERK'S NOTE: The name of the ECF Filer must be preceded by an "s/" and FILER'S FULL NAME MUST BE typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, by 05/22/2019. (JPH) [Entered: 05/18/2019 04:18 PM]
May 18, 2019 CJA FORM 24 and transcript order form filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 05/18/2019. [19-1351] CLERK'S NOTE: The name of the ECF Filer must be preceded by an "s/" and FILER'S FULL NAME MUST BE typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, by 05/22/2019. (JPH) [Entered: 05/18/2019 04:15 PM]
May 18, 2019 MOTION for transcript at government expense filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 05/18/2019. [19-1351] CLERK'S NOTE: The name of the ECF Filer must be preceded by an "s/" and typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, by 05/22/2019. (JPH) [Entered: 05/18/2019 04:08 PM]
May 15, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 05/15/2019. [19-1351] (JPH) [Entered: 05/15/2019 10:46 PM]
May 15, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Edwin Gonzalez and Appellee US filed by Attorney Julia Pamela Heit. Certificate of service dated 05/15/2019. [19-1351] (JPH) [Entered: 05/15/2019 10:44 PM]
May 15, 2019 NOTICE of transfer of case record filed by Attorney Michael C. Bourbeau. Certificate of service dated 05/15/2019. [19-1351] (GB) [Entered: 05/15/2019 10:18 AM]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Appellant's request for appointment of new counsel on appeal is granted. Attorney Julia P. Heit is appointed as counsel under the guidelines of the Criminal Justice Act, 18 U.S.C. 3006A. Attorney Michael C. Bourbeau is allowed to withdraw as counsel and is directed to forward the case record to Attorney Heit at 140 East 28th Street, New York, NY 10016 and provide proof of such service to this court by May 28, 2019 . On or before June 3, 2019 , Attorney Heit must file the docketing statement and a transcript order form, accompanied by a CJA 24 voucher, or a statement certifying that the transcript of all necessary proceedings has been produced and filed in the district court or has already been authorized for production in this court. [19-1351]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to attach a missing document. (GB) [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:17 PM]
May 13, 2019 FORM for selection of counsel on appeal filed Pro Se by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez requesting the appointment of new counsel. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1351] (GB) [Entered: 05/13/2019 02:10 PM]
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript report/order form due 05/29/2019 . [19-1351] (GB) [Entered: 05/02/2019 03:35 PM]
April 30, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2019. [19-1351] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (MCB) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:51 PM]
April 16, 2019 FORM for selection of counsel on appeal filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez requesting the appointment of new counsel. Certificate of service dated 04/16/2019. [19-1351] (MCB) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:03 PM]
April 15, 2019 CRIMINAL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #2867) filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 04/29/2019 . [19-1351] (GB) [Entered: 04/14/2019 04:35 PM]
April 15, 2019 CRIMINAL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #2867) filed by Appellant Edwin Gonzalez. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 04/29/2019 . [19-1351] (GB) [Entered: 04/14/2019 04:35 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US v. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Glenn A. MacKinlay
Represented By: Kelly Begg Lawrence
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Represented By: Christopher John Pohl
Represented By: Kunal Pasricha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EDWIN GONZALEZ, a/k/a Sangriento
Represented By: Edwin Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael C. Bourbeau
Represented By: Julia Pamela Heit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?