Jones v. US
Petitioner / Appellant: EDDIE JONES
Respondent / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 19-1353
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Eddie Jones. Certificate of service dated 05/17/2019. [19-1353] (JHC) [Entered: 05/17/2019 12:51 PM]
May 13, 2019 MOTION for certificate of appealability filed pro se by Appellant Eddie Jones. Certificate of service dated 05/07/2019. [19-1353] (MH) [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:25 AM]
April 23, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Eddie Jones indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 04/23/2019. [19-1353] (JHC) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:07 PM]
April 23, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Eddie Jones. Certificate of service dated 04/23/2019. [19-1353] (JHC) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:06 PM]
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 05/13/2019. Date of denial by district court: March 26, 2019. [19-1353] (MH) [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:51 PM]
April 11, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #450) filed by Appellant Eddie Jones. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 04/25/2019. [19-1353] (MH) [Entered: 04/11/2019 01:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: EDDIE JONES
Represented By: Eddie Jones
Represented By: John H. Cunha Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Fred M. Wyshak Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer H. Zacks
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Represented By: Leah Belaire Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?