Pinero v. Medeiros

Petitioner / Appellant: JEAN PINERO
Respondent / Appellee: SEAN MEDEIROS, Superintendant
Case Number: 19-1355
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 41 (Order entered on May 31, 2019 by Judge Hillman granting certificate of appealability as to petitioner's claim that the Commonwealth did not present sufficient evidence to convict him at trial but denied for his claim that his counsel was ineffective for failing to object to alleged hearsay). [19-1355] (GK) [Entered: 06/04/2019 12:41 PM]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER allowing appellant to apply for an expanded certificate of appealability. Expanded CAP due 07/03/2019. [19-1355] (CP) [Entered: 06/03/2019 03:23 PM]
April 26, 2019 CERTIFICATE of service for transcript report/order form [ # 6249720-2 ], docketing statement [ # 6249719-2 ], notice of appearance [ # 6249716-2 ] filed by Appellant Jean Pinero. Certificate of service dated 04/26/2019. [19-1355] (TJI) [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:29 AM]
April 26, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Jean Pinero indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 04/26/2019. [19-1355] (TJI) [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:26 AM]
April 26, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Jean Pinero. Certificate of service dated 04/26/2019. [19-1355] (TJI) [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:25 AM]
April 26, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Jean Pinero filed by Attorney Thomas J. Iovieno. Certificate of service dated 04/26/2019. [19-1355] (TJI) [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:24 AM]
April 22, 2019 MOTION to stay appellate proceedings pending a District Court decision on Certificate of Appealability filed by Appellant Jean Pinero. Certificate of service dated 04/22/2019. [19-1355] (TJI) [Entered: 04/22/2019 01:41 PM]
April 12, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Sean Medeiros filed by Attorney Jennifer K. Zalnasky. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2019. [19-1355] (JKZ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 08:55 AM]
April 11, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #38) filed by Appellant Jean Pinero. Docketing Statement due 04/25/2019. Appearance form due 04/25/2019. [19-1355] (CP) [Entered: 04/11/2019 03:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinero v. Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JEAN PINERO
Represented By: Thomas Jon Iovieno
Represented By: Jean Pinero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SEAN MEDEIROS, Superintendant
Represented By: Jennifer Kay Zalnasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?