US v. Espinal-Rivera
Defendant / Appellant: LUIS R. ESPINAL-RIVERA, a/k/a Espi, a/k/a Luis Pinal, a/k/a El Gordo
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 19-1366
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued: Defendant-appellant Luis R. Espinal-Rivera is presently in default for failure to file an appendix as required by Fed. R. App. P. 30(a) and 1st Cir. R. 30.0(c). The separately bound appendix is required in addition to the addendum to the brief. It is ordered that if a separate appendix is not filed on or before June 17, 2019 , this appeal may be dismissed in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 45.0(a) for lack of prosecution. [19-1366] (MH) [Entered: 06/10/2019 11:04 AM]
June 4, 2019 NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6257959-2 ] submitted by Appellee US. [19-1366] (JMK) [Entered: 06/04/2019 11:18 AM]
June 3, 2019 APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee US. Certificate of service dated 05/31/2019. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 06/10/2019 . [19-1366] (AMM) [Entered: 06/03/2019 12:18 PM]
May 31, 2019 BRIEF tendered by Appellee US. [19-1366] (AP) [Entered: 05/31/2019 05:23 PM]
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellee US. Brief due 05/31/2019 for appellee United States. Appellant's reply brief shall be filed on, or before, June 13, 2019. [19-1366] (MH) [Entered: 05/30/2019 04:04 PM]
May 29, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellee US. Certificate of service dated 05/29/2019. [19-1366] (AP) [Entered: 05/29/2019 05:07 PM]
May 24, 2019 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6254080-2 ] submitted by Appellant Luis R. Espinal-Rivera. [19-1366] (JMK) [Entered: 05/24/2019 02:13 PM]
May 14, 2019 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Luis R. Espinal-Rivera. Certificate of service dated 05/13/2019. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 05/21/2019 . [19-1366] (AMM) [Entered: 05/14/2019 04:26 PM]
May 13, 2019 BRIEF tendered by Appellant Luis R. Espinal-Rivera. [19-1366] (FJA) [Entered: 05/13/2019 05:23 PM]
May 6, 2019 NOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Boabdil Vazquetelles: 03/06/2019, Bail Hearing. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [19-1366] (MH) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:15 AM]
May 6, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Antonio L. Perez. Certificate of service dated 05/06/2019. [19-1366] (AP) [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:04 AM]
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Appellant's May 1, 2019 motion to extend time to file the brief is granted. Appellant's brief shall be filed on, or before, May 15, 2019. The government's brief shall be filed on, or before, May 29, 2019, and any reply brief shall be filed on, or before, June 11, 2019. [19-1366] (MH) [Entered: 05/06/2019 10:11 AM]
May 2, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Luis R. Espinal-Rivera indicating the following transcript is being ordered: 03/06/2019, Bail Hearing. Payment was authorized under the Criminal Justice Act. Transcript due 05/07/2019 from Court Reporter FTR - PR. [19-1366] (MH) [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:38 AM]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by David J. Barron, Appellate Judge*: Appellant's motion to expedite production of the transcript of the district court's March 6, 2019 detention hearing, is allowed . *Designee of the Chief Judge, United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit. [19-1366] (MH) [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:02 PM]
May 1, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Luis R. Espinal-Rivera. Certificate of service dated 05/01/2019. [19-1366] (FJA) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:17 AM]
April 25, 2019 MOTION to expedite Transcript of Bail Hearing filed by Appellant Luis R. Espinal-Rivera. Certificate of service dated 04/25/2019. [19-1366] (FJA) [Entered: 04/25/2019 10:41 AM]
April 24, 2019 CJA FORM 24 and transcript order form filed by Appellant Luis R. Espinal-Rivera indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 04/24/2019. [19-1366] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (FJA) [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:12 PM]
April 24, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Luis R. Espinal-Rivera. Certificate of service dated 04/22/2019. [19-1366] (FJA) [Entered: 04/24/2019 05:49 PM]
April 24, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Luis R. Espinal-Rivera filed by Attorney Francisco J. Adams-Quesada. Certificate of service dated 04/24/2019. [19-1366] (FJA) [Entered: 04/24/2019 05:47 PM]
April 22, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Mariana E. Bauza. Certificate of service dated 04/22/2019. [19-1366] (MEB) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:29 PM]
April 17, 2019 EXPEDITED briefing schedule set. Brief and appendix due 05/01/2019 for appellant Luis R. Espinal-Rivera. Brief due 05/15/2019 for appellee United States. Reply brief due 05/28/2019 for appellant Luis R. Espinal-Rivera. [19-1366] (MH) [Entered: 04/25/2019 11:59 AM]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Defendant-Appellant Luis R. Espinal-Rivera ("defendant") appeals from the district court's March 22, 2019, Order Affirming Magistrate's Order of Detention. The following briefing schedule shall apply: defendant's brief shall be due on May 1, 2019; the government's brief shall be due on May 15, 2019; and any reply shall be due on May 28, 2019. [19-1366] (MH) [Entered: 04/17/2019 12:20 PM]
April 12, 2019 BAIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #254) filed by Appellant Luis R. Espinal-Rivera. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 04/26/2019. [19-1366] (MH) [Entered: 04/12/2019 11:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: US v. Espinal-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LUIS R. ESPINAL-RIVERA, a/k/a Espi, a/k/a Luis Pinal, a/k/a El Gordo
Represented By: Luis R. Espinal-Rivera
Represented By: Francisco Javier Adams-Quesada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Alberto R. Lopez Rocafort
Represented By: Myriam Yvette Fernandez-Gonzalez
Represented By: Maria L. Montanez-Concepcion
Represented By: Antonio Perez-Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?