Macey v. Berryhill
Plaintiff / Appellant: ARTHUR M. MACEY
Defendant / Appellee: NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Acting Commissioner and NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 19-1418
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Arthur M. Macey. Number of copies: 4. Brief due 07/29/2019 for APPELLEE Nancy A. Berryhill. [19-1418] (AMM) [Entered: 06/27/2019 11:09 AM]
May 23, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 07/02/2019 for appellant Arthur M. Macey. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1418] (AL) [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:15 AM]
May 2, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Nancy A. Berryhill filed by Attorney Jessica Tucker. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2019. [19-1418] (JT) [Entered: 05/02/2019 01:45 PM]
May 1, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #45) filed by Appellant Arthur M. Macey. [19-1418] (AL) [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macey v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ARTHUR M. MACEY
Represented By: Arthur M. Macey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Acting Commissioner
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Represented By: John J. Engel
Represented By: Candace H. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Represented By: John J. Engel
Represented By: Candace H. Lawrence
Represented By: Jessica Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Christopher Alan Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?