US v. Santiago-Serrano
Defendant / Appellant: RAYMOND SANTIAGO-SERRANO, a/k/a Coscu
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 19-1427
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER directing appellant to file a corrected Transcript Report/Order Form by 07/11/2019. [19-1427] (KC) [Entered: 06/27/2019 03:56 PM]
June 20, 2019 DUPLICATE transcript order form filed by Appellant Raymond Santiago-Serrano. [19-1427] (KC) [Entered: 06/21/2019 09:09 AM]
June 17, 2019 PLEADING tendered: Transcript Report/Order Form filed by Appellant Raymond Santiago-Serrano. [19-1427] (KC) [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:14 PM]
June 5, 2019 DOCKET sheet sent to appellant. [19-1427] (KC) [Entered: 06/05/2019 11:41 AM]
June 5, 2019 LETTER sent to Appellant Raymond Santiago-Serrano in repsonse to the undeliverable mail and enclosing a copy of the docket sheet. [19-1427] (KC) [Entered: 06/05/2019 11:40 AM]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Having received returned undeliverable mail related to earlier court transmissions, the deadline for appellant to file his transcript order form(s) is extended to June 19, 2019 . [19-1427] (KC) [Entered: 06/05/2019 11:35 AM]
May 20, 2019 Mail returned as undeliverable to Appellant Raymond Santiago-Serrano. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued April 30, 2019. Forwarded to FCI Schuylkill PO Box 759 Minersville, PA 17954-0759. [19-1427] (ZN) [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:49 PM]
May 2, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Mariana E. Bauza. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2019. [19-1427] (MEB) [Entered: 05/02/2019 01:36 PM]
April 30, 2019 CRIMINAL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #2128) filed by Appellant Raymond Santiago-Serrano. Transcript Report/Order form due 05/14/2019. [19-1427] (KC) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:59 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US v. Santiago-Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RAYMOND SANTIAGO-SERRANO, a/k/a Coscu
Represented By: Raymond Santiago-Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Max J. Perez-Bouret
Represented By: Desiree Laborde-Sanfiorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?