Demos v. Barr, et al
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, STATE OF WASHINGTON, CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DONALD J. TRUMP, President, United States, UNITED STATES, NOEL J. FRANCISCO, Acting Solicitor General and MICHAEL POMPEO, Secretary od State
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHN ROBERT DEMOS
Defendant / Appellee: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA and MICHAEL POMPEO, Secretary of State
Case Number: 19-1428
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 MOTION to reconsider and revisit June 3, 2019 Order [ # 6258120-2 ] filed by Appellant John Robert Demos. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1428] (GB) [Entered: 06/21/2019 10:05 AM]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Appellant John Robert Demos was instructed, by order dated May 8, 2019, that because he has filed more than three lawsuits that have been dismissed as frivolous, he has "three strikes" against him, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and is thus ineligible to bring a civil appeal in forma pauperis unless is "under imminent danger of serious physical injury." Appellant has failed to comply with this order and has instead submitted a financial form for proceeding in forma pauperis. Accordingly, this appeal will be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 3(b) for failure to prosecute on June 17, 2019 unless, within that time, appellant has either paid the full $505 filing fee in the district court and provided notice to this court, or demonstrated in writing that he falls under the exception to the "three strikes" provision to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. [19-1428] (GB) [Entered: 06/03/2019 04:20 PM]
May 20, 2019 MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant John Robert Demos. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1428] (GB) [Entered: 05/20/2019 02:37 PM]
May 20, 2019 NOTICE of appearance and Notice of address filed by Party John Robert Demos. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1428] (GB) [Entered: 05/20/2019 02:35 PM]
May 14, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 05/28/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Karl A. Racine for District of Columbia and State of Washington. [19-1428] (GB) [Entered: 05/14/2019 08:04 AM]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Upon review, it appears that appellant John Robert Demos is ineligible to bring an appeal in a civil action in forma pauperis or to pay the filing fee in installments under the Prison Litigation Reform Act, 28 U.S.C. 1915, because he has filed more than three lawsuits that have been dismissed as frivolous. Accordingly, appellant is ordered either to pay the full $505 filing fee in the district court and submit proof of having done so, or show cause in writing why this appeal should be allowed to proceed. The failure to take either action by May 22, 2019 will lead to dismissal of the appeal for lack of diligent prosecution. [19-1428] (GB) [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:23 PM]
April 29, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #7) filed by Appellant John Robert Demos. Fee due 05/13/2019 . [19-1428] (GB) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demos v. Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP, President, United States
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOEL J. FRANCISCO, Acting Solicitor General
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL POMPEO, Secretary od State
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN ROBERT DEMOS
Represented By: John Robert Demos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL POMPEO, Secretary of State
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?