Gonzalez-Lopez v. State Industrial Prod. Corp., et al

Defendant / Appellee: STATE INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS, INC. and STATE CHEMICAL SALES COMPANY INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: MIGUEL GONZALEZ-LOPEZ
Case Number: 19-1439
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Miguel Gonzalez-Lopez. Brief due 09/23/2019 for appellant Miguel Gonzalez-Lopez. Appendix due 09/23/2019 for appellant Miguel Gonzalez-Lopez. [19-1439] (CP) [Entered: 06/12/2019 11:52 AM]
June 11, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Miguel Gonzalez-Lopez. Certificate of service dated 06/11/2019. [19-1439] (JEP) [Entered: 06/11/2019 05:55 PM]
May 16, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees State Chemical Sales Company International, Inc. and State Industrial Products, Inc. filed by Attorney Mariela Rexach. Certificate of service dated 05/16/2019. [19-1439] (MR) [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:44 PM]
May 15, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees State Chemical Sales Company International, Inc. and State Industrial Products, Inc. filed by Attorney Shiara L. Dilone Fernandez. Certificate of service dated 05/15/2019. [19-1439] (SLD) [Entered: 05/15/2019 04:59 PM]
May 15, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 06/24/2019 for appellant Miguel Gonzalez-Lopez. Appendix due 06/24/2019 for appellant Miguel Gonzalez-Lopez. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1439] (CP) [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:26 AM]
May 15, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Miguel Gonzalez-Lopez. Certificate of service dated 05/15/2019. [19-1439] (JEP) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:06 AM]
May 15, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Miguel Gonzalez-Lopez filed by Attorney Jaime E. Pico-Rodriguez. Certificate of service dated 05/15/2019. [19-1439] (JEP) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:04 AM]
May 15, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Miguel Gonzalez-Lopez filed by Attorney Carlos R. Paula. Certificate of service dated 05/15/2019. [19-1439] (CRP) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:01 AM]
May 1, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #247) filed by Appellant Miguel Gonzalez-Lopez. Docketing Statement due 05/15/2019. Appearance form due 05/15/2019. [19-1439] (CP) [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez-Lopez v. State Industrial Prod. Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Shiara L. Dilone-Fernandez
Represented By: Mariela Rexach
Represented By: Ana Beatriz Rivera-Beltran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE CHEMICAL SALES COMPANY INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Shiara L. Dilone-Fernandez
Represented By: Mariela Rexach
Represented By: Ana Beatriz Rivera-Beltran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIGUEL GONZALEZ-LOPEZ
Represented By: Carlos Rafael Paula
Represented By: Jaime E. Pico-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?