Smith v. MacEachern
Petitioner / Appellant: SAM SMITH
Respondent / Appellee: DUANE J. MACEACHERN, Superintendent Mass Correctional Institution
Case Number: 19-1668
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file opening forms filed by Appellant Sam Smith. Appearance, Docketing Statement, and Transcript report/order form due 09/09/2019. [19-1668] (KC) [Entered: 08/09/2019 10:50 AM]
August 8, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form filed by Appellant Sam Smith. Certificate of service dated 08/08/2019. [19-1668] CLERK'S NOTE: Party selection was incorrect. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (LWO) [Entered: 08/08/2019 11:04 AM]
July 29, 2019 MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Sam Smith. Certificate of service dated 07/29/2019. [19-1668] (LWO) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:54 AM]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file opening forms filed by Appellant Sam Smith. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript report/order form due 08/09/2019. [19-1668] (KC) [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:46 AM]
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. The district court granted petitioner-appellant's request for a certificate of appealability. Accordingly, pursuant to Grant-Chase v. Commissioner, 145 F.3d 431 (1st Circuit. 1998), this appeal can go forward on the issue(s) for which the district court granted the certificate. [19-1668] (KC) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:50 PM]
July 15, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form filed by Appellant Sam Smith. Certificate of service dated 07/15/2019. [19-1668] (LWO) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:44 PM]
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 217 (Motion for Certificate of Appealability) and 221 (Order entered on July 9, 2019 by Judge Gorton granting [217] granting Motion for Certificate of Appealability). [19-1668] (GK) [Entered: 07/10/2019 10:14 AM]
July 9, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Duane J. MacEachern filed by Attorney Thomas E. Bocian. Certificate of service dated 07/09/2019. [19-1668] (TEB) [Entered: 07/09/2019 06:06 PM]
July 5, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #216) filed by Appellant Sam Smith. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 07/19/2019. [19-1668] (KC) [Entered: 07/05/2019 10:09 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. MacEachern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: SAM SMITH
Represented By: Sam Smith
Represented By: Leslie W. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DUANE J. MACEACHERN, Superintendent Mass Correctional Institution
Represented By: Thomas E. Bocian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?