Strahan v. Baynard, et al
Defendant / Appellee: KATHERINE NEWMAN, in her official capacity as acting Chancellor of University of Massachusetts in Boston, PAUL PARLON, DONALD BAYNARD, UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS and KATHERINE NEWMAN, in her official capacity as acting Chancellor of the University of Massachusetts in Boston
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICHARD MAX STRAHAN
Case Number: 19-1673
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 NOTICE of filing the following transcript(s) in district court by Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow: 08/08/2019, Summary Judgment; 01/10/2019, Motion to Dismiss. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [19-1673] (KC) [Entered: 08/23/2019 11:19 AM]
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Show cause response due 09/05/2019. [19-1673] (KC) [Entered: 08/22/2019 02:09 PM]
August 20, 2019 CERTIFICATION of filing transcript filed by Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow. [19-1673] (KC) [Entered: 08/20/2019 04:50 PM]
July 24, 2019 NOTICE of default issued. Appellant failed to file a transcript report/order form by the deadline. If transcripts are necessary for this appeal, appellant is directed to file a transcript order form by 08/07/2019. Absent a timely response, this court will set a briefing schedule, if appropriate. [19-1673] (KC) [Entered: 07/24/2019 08:36 AM]
July 5, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #69) filed by Appellant Richard Max Strahan. Transcript Report/Order form due 07/19/2019. [19-1673] (KC) [Entered: 07/05/2019 11:52 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strahan v. Baynard, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHERINE NEWMAN, in her official capacity as acting Chancellor of University of Massachusetts in Boston
Represented By: Denise Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL PARLON
Represented By: Denise Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD BAYNARD
Represented By: Denise Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Denise Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHERINE NEWMAN, in her official capacity as acting Chancellor of the University of Massachusetts in Boston
Represented By: Denise Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD MAX STRAHAN
Represented By: Richard Max Strahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?