Spencer v. MBTA
Defendant / Appellee: MASSACHUSETTS BAY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Plaintiff / Appellant: PERRY SPENCER
Case Number: 19-1683
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 JUDGMENT dismissing case in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). [19-1683] (CP) [Entered: 09/05/2019 10:04 AM]
August 23, 2019 PLEADING tendered: Transcript Report Order Form filed pro se by Appellant Perry Spencer. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1683] (CP) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:54 PM]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER to Show Cause entered: On July 3, 2019, plaintiff Perry Spencer filed a pro se notice of appeal (No. 52) from the judgment that entered on June 6, 2019 in No. 1:17-cv-11229-FDS (D. Mass.), which this court has docketed as Appeal No. 19-1683. This appeal is duplicative of Appeal No. 19-1674, the notice of appeal (No. 49) filed by counsel on July 2, 2019. Since two cases are not necessary to appeal the judgment, plaintiff-appellant is ordered either to move for voluntary dismissal of Appeal No. 19-1683 pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or to show cause, in writing, why both cases should remain open. The failure to take either action by July 30, 2019 may result in dismissal of Appeal No. 19-1683 for lack of diligent prosecution. 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). [19-1683] (MH) [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:43 AM]
July 8, 2019 A review of the district court docket indicates that a request to proceed in forma pauperis is pending for Appellant Perry Spencer. [19-1683] (MH) [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:13 PM]
July 8, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #52) filed by Appellant Perry Spencer. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 07/22/2019. [19-1683] (MH) [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. MBTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MASSACHUSETTS BAY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Represented By: Christine M. Netski
Represented By: Kathryn R. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PERRY SPENCER
Represented By: Michelle Carnevale
Represented By: James Richard Tewhey
Represented By: Perry Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?