Lu v. Capitol Waste Services, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: BOSTON, MA and CAPITOL WASTE SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: FRIEDRICH LU
Case Number: 19-1758
Filed: August 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 10/07/2019 for appellant Friedrich Lu. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1758] (GB) [Entered: 08/26/2019 09:56 AM]
August 26, 2019 Filing fee was paid in the district court by Appellant Friedrich Lu on 07/30/2019. [19-1758] (GB) [Entered: 08/26/2019 09:41 AM]
August 20, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 09/03/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: John Fahey for Boston, MA. [19-1758] (GB) [Entered: 08/20/2019 08:18 AM]
August 5, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #14) filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. [19-1758]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GB) [Entered: 08/04/2019 06:03 PM]
August 5, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #14) filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Fee due 08/19/2019 . [19-1758] (GB) [Entered: 08/04/2019 06:03 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lu v. Capitol Waste Services, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOSTON, MA
Represented By: John Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAPITOL WASTE SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRIEDRICH LU
Represented By: Friedrich Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?