Aponte-Ramos v. US
Petitioner / Appellant: JOSUE APONTE-RAMOS and JOSUE E. APONTE-RAMOS
Respondent / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 19-1781
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER to Show Cause entered: Attorney Vivianne M. Marrero-Torres has moved to withdraw as counsel for petitioner Josue E. Aponte-Ramos. On or before October 8, 2019 , petitioner must show cause, in writing, why counsel should not be allowed to withdraw, or advise this court whether he will proceed pro se or retain new counsel. If petitioner does not file a written response by October 8, 2019, the motion to withdraw will be granted, and petitioner will be designated as proceeding pro se in this appeal. In light of counsel's motion to withdraw, the time to file a memorandum requesting issuance of a certificate of appealability is enlarged to October 24, 2019 . [19-1781] (GRC) [Entered: 09/24/2019 04:11 PM]
September 19, 2019 MOTION to extend time to request a certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Josue E. Aponte-Ramos. Certificate of service dated 09/19/2019. [19-1781] (VMM) [Entered: 09/19/2019 04:34 PM]
September 19, 2019 MOTION for Attorney Vivianne M. Marrero Torres to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellant Josue E. Aponte-Ramos. Certificate of service dated 09/19/2019. [19-1781] (VMM) [Entered: 09/19/2019 04:26 PM]
August 27, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Josue E. Aponte-Ramos. Certificate of service dated 08/27/2019. [19-1781] (VMM) [Entered: 08/27/2019 08:53 PM]
August 22, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Mariana E. Bauza. Certificate of service dated 08/22/2019. [19-1781] (MEB) [Entered: 08/22/2019 10:36 AM]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 09/19/2019. Date of denial by district court: July 19, 2019. [19-1781] (GRC) [Entered: 08/20/2019 11:35 AM]
August 15, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Josue Aponte-Ramos filed by Attorney Vivianne M. Marrero Torres. Certificate of service dated 08/15/2019. [19-1781] (VMM) [Entered: 08/15/2019 02:40 PM]
August 14, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #28) filed by Appellant Josue Aponte-Ramos. Appearance form due 08/28/2019. Docketing Statement due 08/28/2019. [19-1781] (GRC) [Entered: 08/14/2019 05:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aponte-Ramos v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JOSUE APONTE-RAMOS
Represented By: Eleonora Concepcion Marranzini
Represented By: Josue Aponte-Ramos
Represented By: Vivianne Marie Marrero-Torres
Represented By: Jessica Ellen Earl
Represented By: Franco L. Perez-Redondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JOSUE E. APONTE-RAMOS
Represented By: Eleonora Concepcion Marranzini
Represented By: Vivianne Marie Marrero-Torres
Represented By: Jessica Ellen Earl
Represented By: Franco L. Perez-Redondo
Represented By: Josue E. Aponte-Ramos
Represented By: Eric A. Vos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Nelson Jose Perez-Sosa
Represented By: Antonio Perez-Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?