Vick v. Henrique, et al
Defendant: COMMITTEE FOR PUBLIC COUNSEL SERVICES
Defendant / Appellee: GENEVIEVE HENRIQUE, PETER CAZEAU, STEVEN GREEN, BOSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, LINDA STANFORD and JOSHUA HAYNE
Plaintiff / Appellant: TYRONE L. VICK
Case Number: 19-1788
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 11/18/2019 for appellant Tyrone L. Vick. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1576, 19-1788] (TS) [Entered: 10/08/2019 09:08 AM]
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Appeal No. 19-1576 arises from plaintiff-appellant Tyrone L. Vick's "Notice of Objection" D.E. No. 69 in 1:18-cv-12506-RGS, which was construed as a notice of appeal (D.E. No. 71) from the judgment entered on May 21, 2019. Appeal No. 19-1788 arises from plaintiff-appellant's "general notice of appeal" filed on August 1, 2019 (D.E. No. 79). Appeal Nos. 19-1576, and 19- 1788 are consolidated for purposes of briefing and oral argument. See Fed. R. App. P. 3(b)(2). The briefing schedules in Appeal Nos. 19-1576 and 19-1788 are hereby vacated. The clerk will set a consolidated briefing schedule in due course. The parties are directed to use the above caption on all future filings related to these cases. [19-1576, 19-1788] (TS) [Entered: 10/08/2019 08:52 AM]
October 4, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 11/13/2019 for appellant Tyrone L. Vick. Appendix due 11/13/2019 for appellant Tyrone L. Vick. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1788] (GRC) [Entered: 10/04/2019 04:22 PM]
September 6, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 09/20/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: John Fahey for Boston Police Department, Peter Cazeau, Linda Stanford and Steven Green. [19-1788] (GRC) [Entered: 09/06/2019 05:05 PM]
August 15, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #113) filed by Appellant Tyrone L. Vick. Fee due 08/29/2019.. [19-1788] (GRC) [Entered: 08/15/2019 02:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vick v. Henrique, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GENEVIEVE HENRIQUE
Represented By: Genevieve Henrique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER CAZEAU
Represented By: John Fahey
Represented By: Erika Paula Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN GREEN
Represented By: John Fahey
Represented By: Erika Paula Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: John Fahey
Represented By: Erika Paula Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LINDA STANFORD
Represented By: John Fahey
Represented By: Erika Paula Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSHUA HAYNE
Represented By: Adam J. Hornstine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMITTEE FOR PUBLIC COUNSEL SERVICES
Represented By: Adam J. Hornstine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TYRONE L. VICK
Represented By: Tyrone L. Vick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?