Papadopoulos v. U.S. Government, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: GREGORY PAPADOPOULOS
Defendant / Appellee: ALFONSO FANJUL, a/k/a Alfy and US GOVERNMENT, FBI
Case Number: 19-1825
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 NOTICE of change of address filed by Appellant Gregory Papadopoulos. [19-1825] (CP) [Entered: 10/15/2019 01:59 PM]
October 10, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 11/19/2019 for appellant Gregory Papadopoulos. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1825] (CP) [Entered: 10/10/2019 12:46 PM]
August 21, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #10) filed by Appellant Gregory Papadopoulos. [19-1825] (CP) [Entered: 08/21/2019 09:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Papadopoulos v. U.S. Government, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GREGORY PAPADOPOULOS
Represented By: Gregory Papadopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALFONSO FANJUL, a/k/a Alfy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US GOVERNMENT, FBI
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?