Laz Parking Limited, LLC v. Green
Plaintiff: ROBERT L. RICHARDSON
Defendant: KEOLIS COMMUTER SERVICES, LLC.
Not Yet Classified: LAZ PARKING LIMITED, LLC and CRAIG L. GREEN, d/b/a Green N' Growing Landscaping
Case Number: 19-1834
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 NOTICE issued. After 09/30/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Sarah B. Christie for Craig L. Green, James M. McLaughlin for Craig L. Green, Lawrence H. Behrens for Laz Parking Limited, LLC, Richard A. Davidson for Keolis Commuter Services, LLC. and H. David Leibensperger for Robert L. Richardson. [19-1834] (CP) [Entered: 09/16/2019 01:55 PM]
September 4, 2019 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Craig L. Green. Certificate of service dated 09/04/2019. [19-1834] (DFH) [Entered: 09/04/2019 04:16 PM]
September 3, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Craig L. Green indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 09/03/2019. [19-1834] (DFH) [Entered: 09/03/2019 04:21 PM]
September 3, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Craig L. Green filed by Attorney David F. Hassett. Certificate of service dated 09/03/2019. [19-1834] (DFH) [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:35 PM]
August 21, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #95) filed by Appellant Craig L. Green. Docketing Statement due 09/04/2019. Appearance form due 09/04/2019. [19-1834] (CP) [Entered: 08/21/2019 12:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laz Parking Limited, LLC v. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT L. RICHARDSON
Represented By: H. David Leibensperger
Represented By: Carolyn M. Latti
Represented By: P. Matthew Darby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEOLIS COMMUTER SERVICES, LLC.
Represented By: Richard A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAZ PARKING LIMITED, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence H. Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CRAIG L. GREEN, d/b/a Green N' Growing Landscaping
Represented By: Sarah B. Christie
Represented By: James M. McLaughlin
Represented By: David F. Hassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?