Morris v. Lam, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: CLEMENT G. MORRIS
Defendant / Appellee: DESMOND LAM and SUZANNE LEE, Principal
Case Number: 19-1839
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 JUDGMENT dismissing case in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Defaulted. [19-1832, 19-1839] (GK) [Entered: 10/30/2019 01:01 PM]
October 17, 2019 STATEMENT REGARDING MEDICATIONS filed by Appellant Clement G. Morris in 19-1726. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1726, 19-1832, 19-1839, 19-1840]. (ALW) [Entered: 10/18/2019 12:16 PM]
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Clement G. Morris. Brief due 12/31/2019 for appellant Clement G. Morris. [19-1832, 19-1839] (ALW) [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:07 AM]
September 26, 2019 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss for failure to pay the filing fee. Fee due 10/10/2019. [19-1832, 19-1839] (GK) [Entered: 09/26/2019 03:03 PM]
September 23, 2019 NOTICE Regarding Rep-Payee Application (Form SSA-11-BK) filed by Appellant Clement G. Morris in 19-1726. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1726, 19-1832, 19-1839, 19-1840] (ALW) [Entered: 09/24/2019 03:03 PM]
September 19, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Clement G. Morris in 19-1832, 19-1839. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1832, 19-1839] (ALW) [Entered: 09/20/2019 12:16 PM]
September 17, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 10/28/2019 for appellant Clement G. Morris. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1832, 19-1839] (ALW) [Entered: 09/17/2019 09:52 AM]
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER consolidating cases for purposes of briefing and oral argument. The following case(s) are consolidated: 19-1839 (Consolidated started 09/16/2019) with 19-1832. [19-1832, 19-1839] (ALW) [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:27 PM]
September 13, 2019 PLEADING tendered: Photos filed by Appellant Clement G. Morris in 19-1726, 19-1832, 19-1839, 19-1840. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1726, 19-1832, 19-1839, 19-1840] (ALW) [Entered: 09/13/2019 02:27 PM]
September 11, 2019 PLEADING tendered: Copies of Documents filed by Appellant Clement G. Morris in 19-1832, 19-1839, 19-1840. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1832, 19-1839, 19-1840] (ALW) [Entered: 09/13/2019 02:24 PM]
September 6, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #14) filed by Appellant Clement G. Morris. Fee due 09/20/2019.. [19-1839] (ALW) [Entered: 09/06/2019 12:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Morris v. Lam, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLEMENT G. MORRIS
Represented By: Clement G. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DESMOND LAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUZANNE LEE, Principal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?